Belin v. Jzanus Ltd.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03648 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:03 AM EST |
Defendant
Jzanus Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Belin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 05/30 4:26 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dated 5/29/18 that the Defendants motion to dismiss13 in 17-cv-3648 and12 in 18-cv-0226 is granted; and that pursuant to the Order of consolidation case 18-cv-0897 and 17-cv-5163 is dismissed. ( Ordered by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 5/29/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 05/24 11:49 AM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER dated 5/24/18 granting defendant's13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in case 1:17-cv-03648-BMC; granting12 Motion to Dismiss in case 1:18-cv-00226-BMC. Pursuant to the Order of consolidation, cases 18-cv-0897 and 17-cv-5163, are also dismissed. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/24/2018 ) *forwarded for jgm. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Tue 03/20 8:46 AM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 03/19 2:35 PM
ORDER granting9 and12 nunc pro tunc . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/19/2018. (Weisberg, Peggy) |
||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 03/14 4:07 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan for all further proceedings. Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/14/2018. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Fri 03/09 11:35 AM
Letter to Hon. Sterling Johnson, Jr. by Jzanus Ltd. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Letter
Mon 02/26 10:49 AM
Letter to Hon. Sterling Johnson, Jr., by Jzanus Ltd. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
respoth
Reply in Opposition
Thu 01/25 4:07 PM
REPLY in Opposition re18 Letter , Reply Letter in Opposition to Hon. Brian M. Cogan; filed by Arthur Belin. (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Letter
Wed 01/24 5:10 PM
Letter to Hon. Brian M. Cogan by Jzanus Ltd. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Fri 12/08 12:43 PM
Letter to Hon. Sterling Johnson, Jr., courtesy copies of the parties' filings by Jzanus Ltd. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
16 | 16
respoth
Reply in Support
Fri 12/08 12:37 PM
REPLY in Support of Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint filed by Jzanus Ltd.. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
15 | 15
19
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 12/08 12:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition (Filed on behalf of Plaintiffs) filed by Jzanus Ltd.. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Memo of Law in Opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss | ||
14 | 14
12
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Fri 12/08 12:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint filed by Jzanus Ltd.. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 12/08 12:19 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jzanus Ltd.. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Todd Mittel in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the complaint | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 11/28 10:18 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to10 Letter by Jzanus Ltd.. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 11/03 12:17 PM
Letter to Hon. Margo K. Brodie by Jzanus Ltd. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Tue 10/31 3:26 PM
Letter Advising the Court that Plaintiff has served its Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Arthur Belin (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 09/25 7:14 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File ; Request to adopt the Parties' consensual revised briefing schedule by Arthur Belin. (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Fri 08/18 12:13 PM
Letter by Jzanus Ltd. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scheduling Order
Mon 07/17 3:04 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. In consultation with the District Court, Defendant's request for an extension of time to answer and/or otherwise respond to the Complaint is granted, and the Parties' proposed briefing schedule for Defendant's motion to dismiss is hereby adopted. In lieu of filing an answer, Defendant is to serve its motion to dismiss on or before 8/18/2017. Plaintiff is to serve his opposition on or before 10/2/2017. On or before 10/18/2017, Defendant is to serve its reply and file the fully briefed motion papers on ECF. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/17/2017. (Stackhouse, Noreen) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Fri 07/14 11:01 AM
Letter by Jzanus Ltd. (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/13 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Snyder on behalf of Jzanus Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Snyder, Theodore) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/13 11:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Belin. Jzanus Ltd. served on 6/29/2017, answer due 7/20/2017. (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 2:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Jzanus Ltd.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 2:18 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 2:17 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 2:15 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sterling Johnson, Jr and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/16 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT against Jzanus Ltd. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9611853, filed by Arthur Belin. (Kohn, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |