PopSockets LLC v. Quest USA Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03653 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 3:51 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
Quest Basics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Quest USA Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Isaac Srour
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
PopSockets LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quest Basics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quest USA Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Isaac Srour
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PopSockets LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
90 | 90
notice
Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120
Mon 01/06 3:08 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Hong, Loan) |
|
Att: 1 Electronic order dismissing case | ||
Friday, January 03, 2020 | ||
89 | 89
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/03 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Quest USA Corp., Isaac Srour (Auvil, Steven) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 01/03 4:04 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry89 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/3/2020. (Innelli, Michael) |