Desmond v. Computer Credit, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard D Wexler |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03665 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Computer Credit, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha N.J. Desmond
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 04/13 9:40 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Samantha N.J. Desmond (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/06 2:22 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting13 Motion to Stay. Parties are hereby advised that this matter is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending resolution in DeRosa v. Computer Credit, Inc. as referenced in the motion. Parties are directed to contact this court within 30 days of the decision in the aforementioned matter if they wish to reopen this matter. Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 3/6/2018. (Russo, Eric) |
||
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stay
Mon 03/05 5:18 PM
Letter MOTION to Stay by Computer Credit, Inc.. (Beh, Han) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/26 1:39 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part9 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The request to adjourn the January 10, 2018 initial conference is granted. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose to the Court three alternative dates on which the Court will continue with the conference. Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied as moot in light of plaintiff's filing of the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 12/26/2017. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Letter
Tue 12/19 4:50 PM
Letter Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference by Computer Credit, Inc. (Beh, Han) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - DeRosa Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Somma Complaint | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 12/19 2:28 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference or to Dismiss Action filed by Samantha N.J. Desmond. (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Complaint
Mon 12/18 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Computer Credit, Inc. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Samantha N.J. Desmond. (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Collection Letter | ||
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 12/18 2:48 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference or to Dismiss Action by Computer Credit, Inc.. (Beh, Han) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
Tue 11/21 12:18 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part and denying in part6 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. By letter dated November 20, 2017, plaintiff informs the Court that she intends to serve and file a complaint on defendant by December 5, 2017. Accordingly, the initial conference before the undersigned is adjourned to January 10, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. Defendant's application to appear by telephone is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 11/21/2017. c/ecf (Meehan, James) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 11/20 2:23 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement5 Scheduling Order, to Dismiss without Prejudice or to Allow Appearance by Telephone Consenting to Request for Adjournment of November 28, 2017 Initial Conference filed by Samantha N.J. Desmond. (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 11/16 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ellen Beth Silverman on behalf of Computer Credit, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Silverman, Ellen) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct/Supplement
Fri 11/10 11:25 AM
Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement5 Scheduling Order, to Dismiss without Prejudice or to Allow Appearance by Telephone by Computer Credit, Inc.. (Beh, Han) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/18 12:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/28/2017 11:15 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. See order for instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 10/18/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 GRB Individual Rules | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
State Court Record
Fri 06/23 10:20 AM
STATE COURT RECORD Received from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk (Index # 601305/2017), consisting of the following documents only: Copies of: 1. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal; Certificate of Service; ; Notice of Removal; Notice of Removal; Civil Cover Sheet; Affidavit of Service. (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal; Notice of Removal; Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Clerk's Certification, | ||
Att: 3 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 4 Mailing Envelope | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/20 2:59 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/20 2:57 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 2:59 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 06/16 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Computer Credit, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk, case number 601305/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9612739) (Beh, Han) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons with Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Service |