Damian Stinnie v. Richard Holcomb
Original Case: 3:16-cv-00044
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv.pr-01740 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday May 24, 2018 4:35 AM EDT |
Amicus Supporting Appellant
EQUAL JUSTICE UNDER LAW
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
WESTERN CENTER OR LAW & POVERTY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE OF CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
TZEDEK DC
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
TEXAS APPLESEED
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
SOUTH CAROLINA APPLESEED CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
PUBLIC JUSTICE CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NORTH CAROLINA JUSTICE CENTER
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
NATIONAL CENTER FOR LAW AND ECONOMIC JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
MISSISSIPPI CENTER FOR JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
KANSAS APPLESEED CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
FLORIDA LEGAL SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
COLORADO CENTER ON LAW AND POLICY
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
CENTER FOR JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION OF VIRGINIA
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
ALABAMA APPLESEED CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
VIRGINIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
LAW PROFESSORS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Supporting Appellant
THE INSTITUTE FOR JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RICHARD D. HOLCOMB, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the Virginia Department of Motor Vehicles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAMIAN STINNIE, Individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
NEIL RUSSO, Individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ROBERT TAYLOR, Individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DEMETRICE MOORE, Individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 23 2018
UNPUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00044-NKM-JCH. Copies to all parties and the district court. [17-1740] |
Docket last updated: 11/09/2019 5:39 PM EST |
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00044-NKM-JCH. Case manager: TonyWebb. 17-1740 TW [Entered: 06/16/2017 11:30 AM] | |
2 | 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:16-cv-00044-NKM-JCH. Mailed to: Mary Bauer, Leslie Kendrick, Patrick Levy-Lavelle, Mario Salas & Adam Yost. 17-1740 TW [Entered: 06/16/2017 12:15 PM] |