Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-50748

Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert Summerhays
Case #: 4:17-ap-05074
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2017
Terminated:Sep 26, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Forefront Emergency Management, LP
Represented By
Forefront Emergency Management, LP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason R. Searcy, Trustee of the Saratoga Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Christopher T. Caplinger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/26/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/26 10:32 AM
Disposition of Adversary 17-5074 - Dismissed. (ezra)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/26 10:34 AM
Adversary Case Closed 17-5074 . (ezra)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 10, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 09/11 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 09/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, September 08, 2017
10 10 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/08 1:51 PM
Order Granting Dismissal w/Prejudice in Related [+]. (cath)
Related: [-] 9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff, Jason R. Searcy, Trustee of the Saratoga Liquidating Trust
Thursday, September 07, 2017
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/07 3:24 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice with Certificate of Service Filed by Benjamin W. Kadden on behalf of Jason R. Searcy, Trustee of the Saratoga Liquidating Trust (Kadden, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Status Conference Order Thu 08/24 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Status Conference Order. Related [+]. Notice Date 08/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Fixing Telephone Status Conference
Monday, August 21, 2017
7 7 order Fixing Telephone Status Conference - AP Mon 08/21 1:47 PM
Order Fixing Telephone Status Conference, Related [+] Filed on 8/21/2017 Status Conference Hearing to be held on 9/22/2017 at 08:30 AM at Chambers, Judge Summerhays. (micc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
6 6 order Fixing Telephone Status Conference - AP Mon 08/21 9:33 AM
Order Fixing Telephone Status Conference, Related [+] Filed on 8/21/2017 Status Conference Hearing to be held on 9/15/2017 at 08:30 AM at Chambers, Judge Summerhays. (micc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, August 18, 2017
5 5 misc Statement Fri 08/18 10:12 AM
Statement Related [+] of Corporate Disclosure Filed by Jerry M. Hollander III on behalf of Forefront Emergency Management, LP (Hollander, Jerry)
Related: [-] 4 Answer to Complaint
Thursday, August 17, 2017
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/17 3:40 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jerry M. Hollander III on behalf of Forefront Emergency Management, LP (Hollander, Jerry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/05 4:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Forefront Emergency Management, LP 6/30/2017 . (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 06/28 9:38 AM
Summons Issued on Forefront Emergency Management, LP Date Issued 6/28/2017, Answer Due 7/28/2017 (ezra)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2017
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee Payment - Adversary Proceeding (New) Fri 06/23 5:46 PM
Filing Fee Paid. Receipt Number 50099192, Amount Paid $350.00. Related [+] (adiuser)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, June 16, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (Fee) Fri 06/16 2:31 PM
Adversary case 17-05074 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Jason R. Searcy, Trustee of the Saratoga Liquidating Trust (attorney Christopher T. Caplinger) against Forefront Emergency Management, LP. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount Due $350 (Caplinger, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet