Colonnade Acquisition, LLC
Missouri Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Cynthia A Norton |
Case #: | 6:17-bk-60677 |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Colonnade Acquisition, LLC
245 Jess Jo Parkway
Branson, MO 65616 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago |
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 9/11/12/13
Thu 08/02 10:24 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Graham, Beth) |
||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
court
Case Reassigned
Thu 08/31 7:15 PM
Judge Cynthia A. Norton added to case. Involvement of Judge Arthur B. Federman Terminated. (Parle, Cecelia) |
||
Sunday, July 23, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/23 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/23/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order Dismissing Case w/ PDF
Fri 07/21 12:03 PM
Order Granting Missouri Association Management LLC's Motion for Relief from Stay AND Granting Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC's Motion to Dismiss. (Meador, Dawn) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
hrg
Hearing Held
Thu 07/20 12:45 PM
Hearing Held re: Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Trustee or Examiner Filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC; Motion for Relief from Stay regarding Relief From Automatic Stay to pursue related entities in state court, and requesting the 14 day stay of Rule 4001(a)(3) be waived, Filed by Missouri Association Management LLC. ERO - KS (The Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Missouri Association Management LLC is GRANTED. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC is GRANTED. Court to prepare order.) (Meador, Dawn) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
advother
Exhibit Index Amended or Supplemental
Tue 07/18 2:43 PM
Supplemental Exhibit Index. Filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC (Stolte, Sharon (aty)) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 14 - Branson Municipal Court - Violations | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 15 - Colonnade - Notice fo Sales | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 16 - 12/21/2016 letter from Henry V. Griffin and Michael A. Scheibli to Russell W. Mitchell, Co-Owner | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 17 - 12/21/2016 letter fromHenry V. Griffin and Michael A. Scheibli to Michele O'Malley | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 18 - 3/13/2017 Deposition transcript of Inderjit Grewal | ||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
advother
Exhibit Index
Mon 07/17 4:31 PM
Exhibits for Hearing Scheduled July 20, 2017 ; filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC (Stolte, Sharon (aty)) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Chapter 11 Bankruptcy | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Legal Description | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Condominium for The Colonnade Resort Condominium | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Promissory Note Secured Deed of Trust | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - First Priority Deed of Trust, Security Agreement, Assignment | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Order Appointing Receiver | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Judge's Docket Sheet for July 22, 2016 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Consent Judgment and Order entered May 19, 2017 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Articles of Incorporation | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Limited Liability Operating Agremenet for HOA Management Services, LLC | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Management Agreement between Colonnade Acquisition, LLC and HOA Management Services, LLC | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - Photograph of roof of Colonnade | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - Petition filed in Circuit Court of Taney County, Missouri | ||
24 | 24
advother
Witness List
Mon 07/17 3:59 PM
Witness List for Hearing Scheduled July 20, 2017 by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC (Stolte, Sharon (aty)) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
other
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/14 2:29 PM
Certificate of Service on 07/14/2017 regarding Notice of Rescheduled Hearing filed by Missouri Association Management LLC (Paulson, Robert (aty)) |
|
Att: 1 Rescheduled Hearing | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
other
Certificate of Service
Tue 07/11 1:37 PM
Certificate of Service on 7/11/2017 regarding RESCHEDULED HEARING (ECF #21) ON MOTION TO DISMISS CASE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO APPOINT TRUSTEE OR EXAMINER filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC (Stolte, Sharon (aty)) |
|
21 | 21
hrg
Hearing on Document Reset
Tue 07/11 7:09 AM
Hearing Continued or Rescheduled re: Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Trustee or Examiner Filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC AND The Motion for Relief from Stay regarding Relief From Automatic Stay to pursue related entities in state court, and requesting the 14 day stay of Rule 4001(a)(3) be waived, Filed by Missouri Association Management LLC. The Attorney for the Moving Party is Directed to Serve a Copy of this Notice on Parties NOT Receiving Electronic Notice and File a Certificate of Service within 3 Days. Hearing scheduled for 7/20/2017 at 08:30 AM at Bankruptcy Crtrm, 222 N. John Q Hammons Pkwy, Springfield, MO. (ATTORNEYS MAY APPEAR EITHER AT THE SPRINGFIELD COURTHOUSE, BANKRUPTCY COURTROOM, 222 N. JOHN Q. HAMMONS PKWY, SPRINGFIELD, MO., OR THE KANSAS CITY COURTHOUSE BANKRUPTCY COURTROOM 6B, 400 E. 9TH STREET, KANSAS CITY, MO) (Meador, Dawn) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
ntcords
Relief from Stay - hrg
Mon 07/10 7:06 AM
Notice and Order Setting Hearing The Motion for Relief from Stay regarding Relief From Automatic Stay to pursue related entities in state court, and requesting the 14 day stay of Rule 4001(a)(3) be waived, Filed by Missouri Association Management LLC is scheduled for hearing as given below. Objections and responses must be filed on or before the due date. If no objections are timely filed, the Court may enter an Order without further notice. If an Objection is filed, the hearing will be held as follows. ( A Preliminary Hearing by telephone will also be held as scheduled below. At least 24 hours prior to the Telephone Preliminary Hearing Date and time, the Debtors counsel, Creditors Counsel, and any other party wishing to participate in the hearing, should contact Dawn Meador at 816-512-1924 or by e-mail at Dawn_Meador@mow.uscourts.gov, with a telephone number at which they can be reached for the hearing. ) Subject to this Court's Local Rules of Practice, General Orders and Administrative Procedures, a Witness List and Exhibit Index shall be filed and served not later than three business days before the hearing. In addition to the exhibit index to be filed, complete exhibits shall be redacted, marked and filed in accordance with L.R. 7016-1 as attachments to the exhibit index. Failure to comply may result in exclusion of evidence at hearings. Failure to provide the certificate of service for this Notice and Order Setting Hearing within 3 days after entry may result in denial of the motion. The automatic stay remains in effect until modified or vacated by the Court. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Arthur B. Federman . ( VIDEO CONFERENCE DOCKET; JUDGE IN KC, ATTORNEYS MAY APPEAR EITHER AT THE SPRINGFIELD COURTHOUSE, BANKRUPTCY COURTROOM, 222 N. JOHN Q. HAMMONS PKWY, SPRINGFIELD, MO., OR THE KANSAS CITY COURTHOUSE BANKRUPTCY COURTROOM 6B, 400 E. 9TH STREET, KANSAS CITY, MO ) Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2017 at 11:30 AM at Bankruptcy Crtrm, 222 N. John Q Hammons Pkwy, Springfield, MO. Response due by 7/24/2017. Preliminary Hearing scheduled for 8/3/2017 at 03:10 PM at Telephone Conference. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the ntcords category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Meador, Dawn) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Receipt
Fri 07/07 5:18 PM
Receipt for Motion for Relief from Stay 17-60677 abf11) [motion,mrstay] ( 181.00), with receipt number 14485575, in the amount of 181.00 dollars. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Relief from Stay (Fee Due)
Fri 07/07 5:16 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay regarding Relief From Automatic Stay to pursue related entities in state court , and requesting the 14 day stay of Rule 4001(a)(3) be waived, (filing fee to be paid in the amount of 181 dollars) Filed by Missouri Association Management LLC. (Paulson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Order Appointing Receiver | ||
17 | 17
other
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/07 8:07 AM
Certificate of Service on 7/6/2017 regarding Notice and Order Setting Hearing filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC (Stolte, Sharon (aty)) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
epo
Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan
Thu 07/06 12:44 PM
Ex parte Order of the Court Granting the Debtor(s) Motion to Extend Time to file the Summary of Schedules, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H, Declaration/Verification of Schedules and Matrix, Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, Local Rule 2015-2A and B Statements, Statement of Financial Affairs. The new official bankruptcy forms became effective 12/1/2015, the new forms must be used in all cases. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Arthur B. Federman Incomplete Filings due by 7/20/2017. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the epo category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Meador, Dawn) |
|
15 | 15
other
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorneys ONLY)
Thu 07/06 11:27 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of John T. M. Whiteman on behalf of Missouri Department of Revenue (Whiteman, John (aty)) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time
Wed 07/05 4:36 PM
Motion to Extend Time to file Summary of Schedules, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H, Declaration/Verification of Schedules and Matrix, Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, Local Rule 2015-2A and B Statements, Statement of Financial Affairs, and Corporate Ownership Statement. Extension requested to 7/20/17. Filed by Colonnade Acquisition, LLC. (Brazeale, Diana) |
|
13 | 13
ntcords
(generic) 14 day deadline
Wed 07/05 1:05 PM
Notice and Order Setting Hearing The Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Trustee or Examiner Filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC has been scheduled for a status hearing. If no objection is timely filed, the Court may enter an Order without further notice. Failure to file the certificate of service before the scheduled hearing date may result in delay in the entry of an appropriate order or denial of the motion. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Cynthia A. Norton . If an Objection is filed, the hearing will be held as follows. Status hearing to be held on 7/25/2017 at 11:00 AM at Telephone Conference. Please contact Beth Graham at 816-512-1852 or beth_graham@mow.uscourts.gov with any questions, or with a number at which you can be reached on the scheduled Pretrial Telephone Conference date and time. The moving party is to serve this order on parties not receiving electronic notice but entitled to notice pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2002, Local Rule 2002-1 and other applicable law. File the Certificate of Service and relate it to the ntcords category. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Graham, Beth) |
|
12 | 12
other
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/05 8:00 AM
Certificate of Service on 7/1/2017 regarding Motion to Dismiss Debtor's Chapter 11 Bankruptcy or in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Trustee or Examiner filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC (Stolte, Sharon (aty)) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 06/30 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 06/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 06/30 5:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case or in the Alternative, Motion to Appoint Trustee or Examiner Filed by Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC. (Stolte, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Legal Description | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Declaration of Condominium | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Promissory Note Secured by Deed of Trust | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - First Priority Deed of Trust, Security Agreement, Assignment of Rents and Leases and Fixture Filing | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Order Appointing Receiver | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Judge's Docket Sheet | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Consent Judgment and Order | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Articles of Organization | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Wed 06/28 1:04 PM
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Scheduled. Meeting to be held on 8/14/2017 at 02:30 PM at Jury Assembly Rm, 222 N. John Q Hammons Pkwy, Springfield, MO. (Parle, Cecelia) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Receipt
Thu 06/22 4:24 PM
Receipt for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-60677 11) [other,volp11] (1717.00), with receipt number 14453230, in the amount of 1717.00 dollars. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
epo
Order to Show Cause for CC Fees
Wed 06/21 3:57 PM
Order to Show Cause to Diana Brazeale - Court records indicate that you recently filed a new case on behalf of your client which required a charge for costs thereof. You failed to pay your fees on-line. Accordingly, you are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the $1,717.00 filing fee. Payment of the fee ON LINE will vacate this order to show cause. DO NOT MAIL YOUR PAYMENT. So ORDERED by /s/ Arthur B. Federman Filing Fee of $1,717.00 due by 6/22/2017 The Court will serve this Order on parties not receiving electronic notice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Parle, Cecelia) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Ch 11 Preliminary Matters
Tue 06/20 12:34 PM
Order on Preliminary Matters (Watson, Olivette) |
|
5 | 5
other
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorneys ONLY)
Tue 06/20 11:45 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Sharon L. Stolte on behalf of Greenlake Real Estate Fund LLC (Stolte, Sharon (aty)) |
|
4 | 4
order
OSC Deficiencies (CH 11 Non Individual)
Tue 06/20 10:16 AM
Order to Debtor(s) to Show Cause The Debtor(s) is to Show Cause why the order for relief should not be set aside, these bankruptcy proceedings dismissed and, if applicable, the discharge be denied or revoked for failure to provide Summary of Schedules, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H, Declaration/Verification of Schedules and Matrix, Disclosure of Attorney Compensation, Local Rule 2015-2A and B Statements, Statement of Financial Affairs, . This order will be deemed vacated upon timely compliance with its provisions. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Arthur B. Federman. Incomplete Filings due by 7/5/2017. The Court will serve this Order on parties not receiving electronic notice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Almstedt, Jonathan) |
|
3 | 3
other
Entry of Appearance - text only
Tue 06/20 7:38 AM
Entry of Appearance by Lloyd E. Mueller on behalf of The Office Of The United States Trustee (Mueller, Lloyd (aty)) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
other
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Mon 06/19 7:39 PM
Debtor(s) Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Colonnade Acquisition, LLC (Brazeale, Diana (aty)) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
other
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 06/19 7:37 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. (Filing fee to be paid in the amount of $1717 today.) Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/17/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 10/17/2017. (Brazeale, Diana) |