KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC et al v. PRICE et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Emmet G Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01201 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 5:34 AM EST |
Defendant
CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
THOMAS E. PRICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SEEMA VERMA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, October 19, 2020 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 10/19 7:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Roth, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 12/04 3:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of18 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file a further joint status report within 14 days of the expiration of the deadline to petition the Supreme Court for review of Children's Hops. Assn of Tex. v. Azar, 933 F.3d 764 (D.C. Cir. 2019), if no petition is filed, or, if one is filed, within 14 days of the Supreme Court's disposition of such a petition. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/4/2019. (lcegs2) |
||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Tue 12/03 3:03 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC., PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC. (Carroll, Kelly) |
|
Friday, February 08, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 02/08 4:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties'17 joint status report, the Court will continue to hold this case in abeyance. The parties are directed to file a joint status report within fourteen days of the entry of the D.C. Circuit mandate in Children's Hosp. Ass'n v. Azar, No. 18-5135 (D.C. Cir.). The joint status report should discuss whether further proceedings, if any, are necessary. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/8/2019. (lcegs2) |
||
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/07 8:32 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, THOMAS E. PRICE, SEEMA VERMA. (Myers, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 02/05 11:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report by no later than February 7, 2019, with a recommendation for further proceedings, if any, in light of the voluntary dismissal of the appeal in Children's Hospital Ass'n of Texas v. Azar, 17-844. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/5/2019. (lcegs2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 02/05 11:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2019. (mac) |
||
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 10/01 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven A. Myers (Myers, Steven) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 03/19 10:25 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of15 the parties' joint status report, the Court will continue to hold this case in abeyance. The parties are directed to file a joint status report within fourteen days of either (1) the expiration of defendants' deadline to appeal in the related case of Children's Hospital Ass'n of Texas v. Azar, 17-844, if no appeal is taken, or (2) entry of the D.C. Circuit mandate in 17-844, if an appeal is taken. The joint status report should discuss whether further proceedings, if any, are necessary. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 19, 2018.(lcegs2) |
||
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Fri 03/16 9:47 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC., PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC. (Roth, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 03/15 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC., PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC. Attorney James F. Segroves terminated. (Roth, Robert) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/08 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Roth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Roth, Robert) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stay
Mon 07/24 1:08 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC., PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC(Segroves, James) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/24 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 07/24 8:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 joint motion to stay. This matter is HEREBY STAYED pending resolution of the pending motions in related cases 14-2060 and 17-844. Within fourteen days of entry of an order resolving the dispositive motions in either case, the parties to this case shall file a joint status report advising the Court regarding what, if any, further proceedings may be necessary. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 24, 2017. (lcegs2) |
||
utility
Case Stayed Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/25 6:47 PM
Case Stayed. (zcdw) |
||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
.Order
Wed 07/19 5:31 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 19, 2017 (lcegs1) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Fri 07/07 11:46 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES served on 6/28/2017; THOMAS E. PRICE served on 6/26/2017; SEEMA VERMA served on 6/26/2017, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/27/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/26/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 06/27/2017.(Carroll, Kelly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Return Receipts for Certified Mail, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Delivery Tracking Chart | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Carroll on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Carroll, Kelly) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Tue 06/20 10:43 AM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES, THOMAS E. PRICE, SEEMA VERMA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(sth) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 06/19 3:39 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC. (Segroves, James) |
|
5 | 5
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 06/19 3:38 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC (Segroves, James) |
|
4 | 4
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 06/19 3:36 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC (Segroves, James) |
|
3 | 3
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 06/19 3:35 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC (Segroves, James) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 06/19 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Related Civil Cases by KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC., PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC(Segroves, James) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Thomas E. Price, M.D., in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services; Seema Verma, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services; and Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4996984) filed by KENTUCKY HOSPITAL, LLC, PINELAKE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, PHC-FORT MORGAN, INC., SPRING VIEW HOSPITAL, LLC.(Segroves, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Thomas E. Price, M.D., | ||
Att: 3 Summons Seema Verma, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Jeff Sessions, Attorney General, | ||
Att: 6 Summons Channing D. Phillips | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 9:14 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth) |