Oliver v. Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard D Wexler |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03687 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 11, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 4:18 AM EST |
Defendant
Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jay Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/14 2:34 PM
ORDER on NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) re:5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. So Ordered. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 8/11/2017.) (Fagan, Linda) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 08/02 7:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jay Oliver (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Wed 07/19 12:10 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re4 Notice of Settlement filed by Jay Oliver. Pursuant to the parties representation that this matter has been settled, all deadlines and hearings are stayed, pending settlement. Parties are directed to finalize settlement and file a Stipulation of Discontinuance by 9/1/2017. Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 7/19/2017. (Russo, Eric) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 07/18 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jay Oliver (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/20 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/20 2:07 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/20 2:00 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 2:06 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Cavalry Portfolio Services, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9615590 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jay Oliver. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |