Dotson v. Berryhill
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01753 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
3
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Tue 02/20 2:50 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/20/18. (JAB) |
|
Monday, February 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 02/19 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr..(Bill, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Tue 01/16 10:08 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date February 16, 2018 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) ; ORDERED GRANTED( Social Security Brief due by 2/16/2018.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/16/18. (JAB) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 01/15 12:16 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date February 16, 2018 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Tue 12/05 4:22 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date January 7, 2018 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) ; ORDERED GRANTED( Social Security Brief due by 1/16/2018.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/5/17. (JAB) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 12/05 3:00 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date January 7, 2018 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Wed 11/08 9:40 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date December 7, 2017 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) ; ORDERED GRANTED( Social Security Brief due by 12/7/2017.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/8/2017. (CLO) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 11/07 4:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date December 7, 2017 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Fri 10/06 2:22 PM
Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. ( Social Security Brief due by 11/7/2017.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/6/17. (KKS) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 10/06 9:39 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Plaintiff's Brief ;Proposed extension date November 7, 2017 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Transcript of certified administrative hearing
Thu 09/07 10:53 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Certified Administrative Hearing held on January 19, 2016 re1 Complaint (Social Security),10 Answer to Complaint.(Rund, Jane) |
|
Att: 1 transcript 1, | ||
Att: 2 transcript 2, | ||
Att: 3 transcript 3, | ||
Att: 4 transcript 4, | ||
Att: 5 transcript 5, | ||
Att: 6 transcript 6, | ||
Att: 7 transcript 7, | ||
Att: 8 transcript 8, | ||
Att: 9 transcript 9 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/07 10:50 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Rund, Jane) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Thu 08/03 4:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (Attorney General) filed by Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (JAB) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 07/21 12:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (KKS) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 07/14 12:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 7/11/2017, answer due 9/11/2017. (KKS) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Entry of Appearance
Thu 07/13 11:41 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Rund, Jane) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/20 12:52 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/20/17. (JAB) |
|
4 | 4
order
Case Management Order
Tue 06/20 12:51 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). This case is assigned to Track: 4. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/20/17. (JAB) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 06/20 2:06 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (JAB) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Affidavit - CJA 23
Mon 06/19 1:44 PM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/19 1:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ricky A. Dotson, Jr.. (Bill, Karen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Social Security)
Mon 06/19 1:43 PM
Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Ricky A. Dotson, Jr..(Bill, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 06/19 4:10 PM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG) |