Preferred Care, Inc., et al v. Jesse Roberts
Original Case: 5:16-cv-00203
Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-05692 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 07, 2022 2:26 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee Cross-Appellant
JESSE ROBERTS, as Administrator of the Estate of Kenneth Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PREFERRED CARE, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
KENTUCKY PARTNERS MANAGEMENT, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
PREFERRED CARE PARTNERS MANAGEMENT GROUP, LP
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant Cross-Appellee
STANTON HEALTH FACILITIES, LP, dba Stanton Nursing and Rehabilitation Center
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/07/2022 2:26 AM CST |
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
The case manager for this case is: Jennifer Earl (JE) | ||
Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. 17-5687 17-5692 (MLB) | ||
Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellee Cross-Appellant Jesse Roberts. Transcript needed: n. (JE) | ||
BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: first brief due 07/31/2017. second brief due 08/28/2017. third brief due 09/27/2017. 17-5687 17-5692 (JE) | ||
A Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 07/17/2017 at 2:00 PM (ET) with Rod McFaull. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] 17-5687 17-5692 (MLB) | ||
**** LOCKED: Counsel to refile appearance form only listing on the form and filing for the cross-appellee Stanton Health Facilities, LP. According to the notice of appeal all other parties listed on the form not parties of the cross appeal. **** APPEARANCE filed for Kentucky Partners Management, LLC, Preferred Care Partners Management Group, LP, Preferred Care, Inc. and Appellant Cross-Appellee Stanton Health Facilities, LP by Kristin M. Lomond. Certificate of Service: 06/19/2017.--[Edited 06/21/2017 by JE] (KML) | ||
**** LOCKED: Counsel to refile appearance form only listing on the form and filing for the cross-appellee Stanton Health Facilities, LP. According to the notice of appeal all other parties listed on the form not parties of the cross appeal. ****APPEARANCE filed for Kentucky Partners Management, LLC, Preferred Care Partners Management Group, LP, Preferred Care, Inc. and Appellant Cross-Appellee Stanton Health Facilities, LP by Donald L. Miller, II. Certificate of Service: 06/19/2017.--[Edited 06/21/2017 by JE] (DLM) |