Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Alicia O Valle
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:17-cv-61217
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 20, 2017
Terminated:Jan 05, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
Jetsmarter, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow PA
contact info
Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Kopelowitz Ostrow
contact info
Defendant
Sergey Petrossov
Represented By
Jeffrey Miles Ostrow
Kopelowitz Ostrow PA
contact info
Jonathan Marc Streisfeld
Kopelowitz Ostrow
contact info
Mediator
Martin Soll
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert One W. Las Olas Blvd. Suite 500
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301
Plaintiff
Grace Lamey
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Hazel Solis Rojas
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Baum
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Hazel Solis Rojas
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tatiana Morillo
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Hazel Solis Rojas
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph Benson
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Janay Coleman
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Davies
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather Jorgensen
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Abigail Listo
Represented By
Keith Michael Stern
Law Office Of Keith M. Stern, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, January 05, 2018
54 54 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 01/05 4:56 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 1/5/2018. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
53 53 motion Settlement Dismiss Thu 01/04 5:58 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval ( Responses due by 1/18/2018), Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice1 Complaint, Based on In Camera Review of Confidential Settlement by Grace Lamey.(Solis Rojas, Hazel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
52 52 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 01/03 2:53 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Trial. Judge Beth Bloom no longer assigned as presider/referral judge(s) in case. All deadlines are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/3/2018. (mc)
Related: [-]
51 51 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 01/03 8:26 AM
Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Grace Lamey (Stern, Keith)
Related: [-]