Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC v. Walters Trucking, Inc.
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01762 |
Nature of Suit | 450 Other Statutes - Commerce |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 3:05 AM CST |
Defendant
Walters Trucking, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Wed 11/22 11:02 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, in accordance with this Court's Order dated October 23, 2017, defendant Walters Trucking, Inc. shall pay to plaintiff's attorney Boye Brasher LLC, within 14 days, $5,185.00 for attorneys' fees incurred as a result of defendant's removal of this case. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/22/17. (CSG) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Response to Court
Fri 11/03 11:00 AM
RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re23 Memorandum & Order,, by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC.(Godsy, Ralph) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ralph Godsy re Attorney's Fees | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
5
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 10/23 4:46 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion to remand (#9) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for St. Louis County, Missouri. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees (#12) is GRANTED; plaintiff shall submit appropriate documentation supporting an award of attorneys' fees within 14 days. ( Response to Court due by 11/6/2017.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/23/17. (MRS) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 09/05 11:17 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 setting of today at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED pending the resolution of the outstanding motion to remand. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/5/17. (CSG) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/23 10:51 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Conference reset for 9/5/2017 10:00 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/23/17. (MRS) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Rule 16 Order
Tue 08/22 9:46 AM
RULE 16 ORDER Rule 16 Conference reset for 8/30/2017 04:00 PM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/22/17. (MRS) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Joint Scheduling Plan
Mon 08/14 4:22 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC. Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan . (Godsy, Ralph) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 08/14 3:38 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Associate Division of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri Mid-America's Reply in Support of its Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC. (Godsy, Ralph) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/07 4:36 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Associate Division of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri,12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) filed by Defendant Walters Trucking, Inc..(Toft, Robbye) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT)
Mon 08/07 4:05 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Exhibit A, Exhibit B by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC.(Godsy, Ralph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit B | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 07/31 3:32 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Associate Division of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri,10 Memorandum in Support of Motion,13 Memorandum in Support of Motion,12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) with consent by Defendant Walters Trucking, Inc. (Toft, Robbye) filed by Walters Trucking, Inc. ; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/31/17. (CSG) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/31 2:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Associate Division of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri,10 Memorandum in Support of Motion,13 Memorandum in Support of Motion,12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) with consent by Defendant Walters Trucking, Inc.. (Toft, Robbye) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 07/20 4:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re12 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) filed by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC. (Godsy, Ralph) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 07/20 4:31 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC. (Godsy, Ralph) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Wed 07/19 5:40 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC.. (Godsy, Ralph) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 07/19 5:38 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re9 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Associate Division of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC. (Godsy, Ralph) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 07/19 5:36 PM
MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Associate Division of the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri by Plaintiff Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC. (Godsy, Ralph) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/18 11:18 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/14/2017. Rule 16 Conference re-set for 8/21/2017 10:30 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/18/17. (CSG) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Rule 16 Order
Mon 06/26 4:37 PM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2, Standard Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/19/2017. Rule 16 Conference set for 7/26/2017 02:00 PM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr... Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/26/17. (MRS) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/23 4:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Walters Trucking, Inc..(Toft, Robbye) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Thu 06/22 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Walters Trucking, Inc. electronic acknowledgment Sent To: State Court - Executed (Toft, Robbye) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/21 3:31 PM
Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Wed 06/21 3:27 PM
Petition Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Mid-America Freight Logistics, LLC.(MFG) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Tue 06/20 3:01 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Walters Trucking, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Toft, Robbye) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Tue 06/20 2:56 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Walters Trucking, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Toft, Robbye) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Tue 06/20 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 17SL-AC12143, with receipt number 0865-6012024, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Walters Trucking, Inc..(Toft, Robbye) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form |