Parker v. Steele
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Abbie Crites-Leoni |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01763 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Petitioner
Salathal C. Parker
|
|
Respondent
Troy Steele
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark
Fri 06/23 2:41 PM
***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in Western District of Missouri as case 6:17-cv-03187, filed 06/21/2017. (CSG) |
||
misc
Remark
Fri 06/23 4:24 PM
***REMARK - Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in Western District of Missouri as case 6:17-cv-03187. (KXS) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Wed 06/21 2:43 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Salathal C. Parker. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is provisionally granted, subject to modification by the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. See 28 U.S.C. § 2241(d). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 6/21/17. (CSG) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 06/21 2:43 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Wed Jun 21 14:43:37 CDT 2017 (Gould, Cathy) |
||
misc
Remark
Wed 06/21 2:52 PM
***REMARK -- Case electronically transferred to Western District of Missouri via CM/ECF extraction. (CSG) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Tue 06/20 6:28 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 06/20 3:07 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 06/20 3:08 PM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Abbie S. Crites-Leoni. (DJO) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Tue 06/20 4:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jun 20 16:01:29 CDT 2017 (admin,) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/20 3:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Salathal C. Parker. (DJO) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 06/20 3:06 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Salathal C. Parker.(DJO) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-M, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement to Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 4 Judge Assignment Label, | ||
Att: 5 Correspondence, | ||
Att: 6 Envelope |