EBONG v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Emmet G Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01226 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 5:08 AM EST |
Defendant
UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SYLVIA EBONG
815 Pershing Drive Apt. 143
Silver Spring, MD 20910 |
Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago |
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 09/05 5:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of7 letter from Plaintiff requesting dismissal, the Court hereby dismisses this case without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/5/2017. (lcegs3) |
||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Fri 09/01 11:08 AM
Letter from Sylvia Ebong. "Leave to file granted" signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/27/2017 (jf) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/28 5:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE.(Peterson, Benton) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
.Order
Wed 07/19 5:22 PM
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 7/19/2017 (lcegs1) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents
Fri 07/07 3:02 PM
Receipt on 7 05-2017 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 17-CA-003248. (zrdj) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 06/29 9:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting3 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by no later than August 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/29/2017. (lcegs3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 06/29 9:35 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Or Otherwise Response To Plaintiff's Complaint due by 8/30/2017. (mac) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 06/27 10:40 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE(Peterson, Benton) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice to Counsel/Party
Fri 06/23 3:01 PM
NOTICE to Party re1 Notice of Removal. (md) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/21 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 2017CA3248 filed by UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE.(Peterson, Benton) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/23 2:47 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) |