Cambridge Christian School, I v. Florida High School Athletic A
Original Case: 8:16-cv-02753
Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-prici-12802 |
Type | private civil / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Nov 14, 2019 2:17 PM EST |
JOSEPH C. SHARP
|
Represented By
|
FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE
|
Represented By
|
FREEDOM FROM RELIGION FOUNDATION, INC.,
|
Represented By
|
FLORIDA FREETHOUGHT COMMUNITY
|
Represented By
|
NATIONAL FEDERATION OF STATE HIGH SCHOOL ASSOCIATIONS
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
AMERICAN CENTER FOR LAW AND JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae
ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SCHOOLS INTERNATIONAL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
FLORIDA HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CAMBRIDGE CHRISTIAN SCHOOL, INC.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Nov 13 2019
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Cambridge Christian School, Inc.. Decision: Affirmed in part, Reversed in part, and Remanded. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.--[Edited 11/13/2019 by DHC] |
1. | Federal court reverses decision barring Christian schools from praying over loudspeaker before games (foxnews.com) |
Submitted Thu 11/14/2019 | |
Docket last updated: 11/14/2019 2:18 PM EST |