Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Randal S Mashburn
Case #: 3:13-bk-10974
Case Filed:Dec 31, 2013
Creditor Meeting:Feb 05, 2014
Terminated:Oct 14, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Sep 02, 2014

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
New Life International
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin, PLLC c/o G. Rhea Bucy 150 3rd Ave South, Suite 1700
Nashville, TN 37201
Represented By
LINDA W. KNIGHT
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin
contact info
M TAYLOR HARRIS, JR
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin, PLLC
contact info
THOMAS H. FORRESTER
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin
contact info
G. RHEA BUCY
Gullett, Sanford, Robinson, Martin
contact info
DEAVER HIATT COLLINS
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin PLLC
contact info
Debtor
NEW LIFE INTERNATIONAL
1233 Northgate Business Pkwy
Madison, TN 37115-2475
Represented By
LINDA W. KNIGHT
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin
contact info
M TAYLOR HARRIS, JR
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin, PLLC
contact info
THOMAS H. FORRESTER
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin
contact info
G. RHEA BUCY
Gullett, Sanford, Robinson, Martin
contact info
DEAVER HIATT COLLINS
Gullett Sanford Robinson & Martin PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203
Represented By
TYLER RICHARD YEAGER
Us Dept Of Justice
contact info
CHARLES M WALKER
Office Of Us Trustee
contact info
LLOYD E MUELLER
United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Friday, October 14, 2016
489 489 order Final Decree Chapter 11 Fri 10/14 11:33 AM
Final Decree Issued. Chapter 11 case is closed. IT IS ORDERED that the trustee, if one was appointed, is discharged as trustee of this estate. Signed on 10/14/2016. (jmw)
Related: [-]