Rivera-Gomez v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel R Dominguez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01873 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Wed 04/24 3:53 PM
JUDGMENT: For the reasons stated in the Government's Motion to Dismiss, and as mandated by the First Circuit Court of Appeals in the Judgment entered at Docket No. 8, Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (Docket Nos. 1) is hereby DENIED and the case is thus DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ordered that no certificate of appealability should be issued in the event that Petitioner files a notice of appeal because there is no substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right within the meaning of 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(3). THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/24/2019.(MES) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Vacate
Wed 04/24 3:51 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying1 Motion to Vacate. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 4/24/2019. (MES) |
|
Wednesday, April 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 04/03 3:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Luis Raul Rivera-Gomez filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 4/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/03 2:47 PM
COPY of JUDGMENT of USCA as to Luis Raul Rivera-Gomez (2) entered on 04/02/19; Petitioner seeks leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. § 2255 motion featuring a challenge to one or more 18 U.S.C. § 924(c) convictions under Johnson v. United States, 135 S. Ct. 2551 (2015) (Johnson II), and related precedent. Accordingly, the application for leave to file a second or successive § 2255 motion is DENIED. Th[is]... denial of an authorization... to file a second or successive application shall not be appealable and shall not be the subject of a petition for rehearing or for a writ of certiorari. (xi) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Staying Case
Thu 07/19 11:14 AM
ORDER STAYING CASE: The instant case is hereby STAYED pending a ruling from the First Circuit on the Petitioner's second successive 2255. The Petitioner is to advice the Court within five (5) days of the First Circuit's ruling. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/19/2018. (MES) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Thu 07/19 11:12 AM
ORDER noted5 Motion In Compliance. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/19/2018. (MES) |
|
5 | 5
motion
In Compliance
Thu 07/19 11:06 AM
Motion In Compliance Regarding Status of Case as to 4 Status Report Order, filed by Eleonora C. Marranzini on behalf of Luis Raul Rivera-Gomez Responses due by 8/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marranzini, Eleonora) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Status Report Order
Thu 07/05 1:47 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Parties are to inform the Court the status of the First Circuit's ruling on Petitioner's application for a second/successive motion. Status Report due by July 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/5/2018. (MES) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order
Mon 08/14 2:57 PM
STANDING ORDER RE: CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/4/2017.(gav) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Wed 07/05 10:16 AM
ORDER holding in abeyance1 Motion to Vacate and granting1 Motion to Stay. Petitioner is to advise the Court of the First Circuit's ruling on his petition to file a second successive 2255 within five (5) days of the decision. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 7/5/2017. (JM) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Fri 06/23 5:19 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion to Stay Proceedings (Criminal Number 94-002 (JAF)) filed by Eleonora C. Marranzini on behalf of Luis Raul Rivera-Gomez Responses due by 7/7/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marranzini, Eleonora) |