Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert E Payne
Referred: Mark R Colombell
Case #: 3:17-cv-00461
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2017
Terminated:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
Ascension Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Justin Alexander Gray
Rosette, LLP
contact info
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Karrie Sue Wichtman
Rosette, LLP
contact info
Timothy James St. George
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
James Williams, Jr.
Represented By
Justin Alexander Gray
Rosette, LLP
contact info
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Karrie Sue Wichtman
Rosette, LLP
contact info
Timothy James St. George
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
Susan McGeshick
Represented By
Justin Alexander Gray
Rosette, LLP
contact info
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Karrie Sue Wichtman
Rosette, LLP
contact info
Timothy James St. George
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
Gertrude McGeshick
Represented By
Justin Alexander Gray
Rosette, LLP
contact info
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Karrie Sue Wichtman
Rosette, LLP
contact info
Timothy James St. George
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
Matt Martorello
Represented By
David Foster Herman
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
Jonathan Peter Boughrum
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Timothy James St. George
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Richard Lawrence Scheff
Montgomery Mccracken Walker & Rhoads LLP
contact info
Defendant
Giiwegiizhigookway Martin
Represented By
Justin Alexander Gray
Rosette, LLP
contact info
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Karrie Sue Wichtman
Rosette, LLP
contact info
Timothy James St. George
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Defendant
Big Picture Loans, LLC
Represented By
Justin Alexander Gray
Rosette, LLP
contact info
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Karrie Sue Wichtman
Rosette, LLP
contact info
Timothy James St. George
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info
Plaintiff
George Hengle
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Felix Gillison, Jr.
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dowin Coffy
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Turnage
739 N. Laburnum Avenue Apt. 1
Richmond, VA 23223
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lula Williams
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Guzzo
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
James Wilson Speer
Virginia Proverty Law Center
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
Kelly & Crandall PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Daniel Gravel
Terminated: 10/18/2017
Represented By
David Neal Anthony
Troutman Sanders Llp (richmond)
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, November 01, 2024
1566 1566 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Fri 11/01 10:44 AM
ORDER that the Motion to Vacate1564 is granted andthe ORDER entered on October 18, 20241562 is vacated. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Robert E. Payne on 11/1/2024. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
1565 1565 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/01 10:32 AM
ORDER. This matter comes before the Court sua sponte concerning the Order Regarding Procedures for Settlement Conference, entered on October 18, 2024. (ECF No.1561 .) As a result of clerical error, the Court hereby VACATES the Order Regarding Procedures for Settlement Conference. (ECF No.1561 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 11/1/24. (jsau, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
1564 1564 motion Vacate Fri 10/25 6:45 PM
Consent MOTION to Vacate by Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams.(Kelly, Kristi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order