Gez Agolli v. CA Progressive Medical Centers, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04665 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 20, 2017 12:43 AM PST |
Defendant
Ashot Vardanyan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive Medical Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Progressive Medical, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Progressive Professional Medical Management, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive Wellness Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Gevorg Vardanyan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frances Young
|
|
Defendant
Charles Zanco
|
|
Defendant
Hamik Zeytuntsyan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tigran Zeytuntsyan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
In Forma Progressive Fitness, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kevin Banion
|
|
Defendant
David C. Bianconi
|
|
Defendant
CA Progressive Medical Centers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andrea Columbu
|
|
Defendant
Valentine Gasparian
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Zeev N. Kain
|
|
Defendant
Nerses Nakshehyan
|
|
Plaintiff
Gez Agolli
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Progressive Medical, Inc.
Terminated: 08/18/2017
|
|
Defendant
Progressive Specialty Therapy Services, LLC
Terminated: 11/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gurpeet Singh
Terminated: 11/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc.
Terminated: 11/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Institute for Progressive Medicine
Terminated: 09/21/2017
|
|
Defendant
Allan E. Sosin
Terminated: 09/21/2017
|
|
Defendant
Tim Boylan
Terminated: 11/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Suzann Gage
Terminated: 09/21/2017
|
|
Defendant
Progressive Medical
Terminated: 09/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Helen Kent
Terminated: 09/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ben Kush
Terminated: 11/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank Kush
Terminated: 11/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark M. Martin
Terminated: 08/18/2017
|
|
Defendant
Justin Mellit
Terminated: 11/27/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive Health Services
Terminated: 09/21/2017
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
minutes
Show Cause Hearing ~Util - Link Non-Motion Documents to Minutes ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/08 10:42 AM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu. On November 27, 2017, the Court set an order to show cause re settlement pursuant to counsel's representation (see, Docket No.44 ). Based on the representation of counsel and their failure to appear at today's hearing, the Court hereby dismisses the above-entitled action without prejudice. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
minutes
Motion Hearing ~Util - Terminate Hearings Dismiss Case ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/28 11:15 AM
MINUTES OF DEFENDANTS' AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS ALL OF PLAINTIFF'S CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 12(B)(6); SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu re:32 MOTION to Dismiss Case. Settlement is reached. The Court sets an Order to Show re: Settlement Hearing for December 7, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are advised that the order to show cause will be vacated, and no appearance will be required provided that a dismissal is filed by noon on December 6, 2017. The above-entitled motion is deemed MOOT and the scheduling conference is vacated. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) |
|
43 | 43
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Mon 11/27 1:35 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Tim Boylan, Ben Kush, Frank Kush, Justin Mellit, Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc.. (Doroshow, James) |
|
42 | 42
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Mon 11/27 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Progressive Specialty Therapy Services, LLC, Gurpeet Singh. (Doroshow, James) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Report
Thu 10/26 5:02 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. (Doroshow, James) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Thu 10/26 1:21 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATED REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS approved by Judge George H. Wu, re Notice of Continuance39 . (Motion continued to 11/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Continuance
Tue 10/24 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Continuance of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 32 reset to 11/27/2017 at 8:30 a.m.(Cohen, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Continuance | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Thu 10/19 7:27 PM
REPLY Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 32 filed by Defendants CA Progressive Medical Centers, Inc., Valentine Gasparian, Ashot Vardanyan, Gevorg Vardanyan, Hamik Zeytuntsyan, Tigran Zeytuntsyan. (Attorney Michael Navid Cohen added to party CA Progressive Medical Centers, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cohen, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 10/16 10:33 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS ALL OF PLAINTIFFS CAUSES OF ACTION PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 12(B)(6)32 previously scheduled for 11/02/2017 to 11/16/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 10/12 4:46 PM
OPPOSITION to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 32 of Progressive Recovery Solutions, LLC, etc., et al. filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. (Doroshow, James) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 10/12 10:18 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ron A Stormoen counsel for Defendants Tim Boylan, Ben Kush, Frank Kush, Justin Mellit, Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc.. Adding Travis D. Ensign as counsel of record for Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc., Tim Boylan, Frank Kush, Beth Kush and Justin Mallit for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Tim Boylan; Beth Kush; Frank Kush; Justin Mallit; Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc.. (Stormoen, Ron) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 10/11 5:06 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James E Doroshow counsel for Plaintiff Gez Agolli. Adding Henry Louis Whitehead as counsel of record for Gez Agolli for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. (Doroshow, James) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
For Judicial Notice
Tue 10/03 12:47 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 32 filed by Defendants Valentine Gasparian, Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC, Ashot Vardanyan, Gevorg Vardanyan, Hamik Zeytuntsyan, Tigran Zeytuntsyan.(Cohen, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
32 | 32
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 10/03 12:45 PM
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Valentine Gasparian, Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC, Ashot Vardanyan, Gevorg Vardanyan, Hamik Zeytuntsyan, Tigran Zeytuntsyan. Motion set for hearing on 11/2/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Cohen, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
31 | 31
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Tue 10/03 12:38 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss Case,,29 filed by Defendants Valentine Gasparian, Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC, Ashot Vardanyan, Gevorg Vardanyan, Hamik Zeytuntsyan, Tigran Zeytuntsyan. (Cohen, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/27 2:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/26/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss Case
Tue 09/26 8:33 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Valentine Gasparian, Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC, Ashot Vardanyan, Gevorg Vardanyan, Hamik Zeytuntsyan, Tigran Zeytuntsyan. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Cohen, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Cohen, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 of Michael Cohen, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration Tigran Zeytuntsyan, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 of Tigran Zeytuntsyan, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 of Tigran Zeytuntsyan | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 09/25 9:19 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)27 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Sunday, September 24, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sun 09/24 7:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Gurpeet Singh.(Attorney Shawn M Krogh added to party Gurpeet Singh(pty:dft))(Krogh, Shawn) |
|
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sun 09/24 7:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Progressive Specialty Therapy Services, LLC.(Attorney Shawn M Krogh added to party Progressive Specialty Therapy Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Krogh, Shawn) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Errata
Thu 09/21 1:07 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. correcting Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))18 re Progressive Medical, LLC (Doroshow, James) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 09/21 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Progressive Medical. (Doroshow, James) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 09/21 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Suzann Gage. (Doroshow, James) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 09/21 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Progressive Health Services. (Doroshow, James) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 09/21 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Allan E. Sosin. (Doroshow, James) |
|
20 | 20
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 09/21 10:34 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Institute for Progressive Medicine. (Doroshow, James) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 09/21 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Helen Kent. (Doroshow, James) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 09/21 10:29 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Progressive Medical, LLC. (Doroshow, James) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 09/19 3:19 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ron A Stormoen counsel for Defendants Tim Boylan, Ben Kush, Frank Kush, Justin Mellit, Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc.. Adding Ron A. Stormoen as counsel of record for Tim Boylan; Frank Kush; Beth Kush; Justin Mallit; Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Tim Boylan; Beth Kush; Frank Kush; Justin Mallit; Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc.. (Stormoen, Ron) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 09/19 3:12 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Tim Boylan, Ben Kush, Frank Kush, Justin Mellit, Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc., (Stormoen, Ron) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 09/19 3:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Tim Boylan, Ben Kush, Frank Kush, Justin Mellit, Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc..(Attorney Ron A Stormoen added to party Tim Boylan(pty:dft), Attorney Ron A Stormoen added to party Ben Kush(pty:dft), Attorney Ron A Stormoen added to party Frank Kush(pty:dft), Attorney Ron A Stormoen added to party Justin Mellit(pty:dft), Attorney Ron A Stormoen added to party Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stormoen, Ron) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 09/08 12:52 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Progressive Medical answer now due 9/29/2017; Helen Kent answer now due 9/29/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Progressive Medical; Helen Kent.(Attorney James F Monagle added to party Helen Kent(pty:dft), Attorney James F Monagle added to party Progressive Medical(pty:dft))(Monagle, James) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 09/07 4:30 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hamik Zeytuntsyan answer now due 9/26/2017; Ashot Vardanyan answer now due 9/26/2017; Valentine Gasparian answer now due 9/26/2017; Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC answer now due 9/26/2017; Gevorg Vardanyan answer now due 9/26/2017; Tigran Zeytuntsyan answer now due 9/26/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Hamik Zeytuntsyan; Ashot Vardanyan; Valentine Gasparian; Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC; Gevorg Vardanyan; Tigran Zeytuntsyan.(Attorney Michael Navid Cohen added to party Valentine Gasparian(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Navid Cohen added to party Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Navid Cohen added to party Ashot Vardanyan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Navid Cohen added to party Gevorg Vardanyan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Navid Cohen added to party Hamik Zeytuntsyan(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Navid Cohen added to party Tigran Zeytuntsyan(pty:dft))(Cohen, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Wed 08/16 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Mark M. Martin. (Doroshow, James) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Wed 08/16 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Progressive Medical, Inc.. (Doroshow, James) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 06/27 2:57 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (kss) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Errata
Mon 06/26 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Doroshow, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
8 | 8
notice
Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) (Notice to Counsel) - optional html form
Mon 06/26 11:01 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 06/26 9:50 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kevin Banion, David C. Bianconi, Tim Boylan, CA Progressive Medical Centers, Inc., Andrea Columbu, Suzann Gage, Valentine Gasparian, In Forma Progressive Fitness, Inc., Institute for Progressive Medicine, Zeev N. Kain, Helen Kent, Ben Kush, Frank Kush, Mark M. Martin, Justin Mellit, Nerses Nakshehyan, Progressive Health Services, Progressive Medical, Progressive Medical Services, Inc., Progressive Medical Specialists, Inc., Progressive Medical, Inc., Progressive Medical, Inc.(which Will Do Business in California as Progressive Medical DBCA, a California corporation), Progressive Medical, LLC, Progressive Professional Medical Management, Inc., Progressive Recovery Solutions LLC, Progressive Specialty Therapy Services, LLC, Progressive Wellness Center, LLC, Gurpeet Singh, Allan E. Sosin, Ashot Vardanyan, Gevorg Vardanyan, Frances Young, Charles Zanco, Hamik Zeytuntsyan, Tigran Zeytuntsyan. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 06/26 9:38 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 06/26 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 06/23 4:52 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli, (Doroshow, James) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Fri 06/23 4:47 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. (Doroshow, James) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 06/23 4:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. (Doroshow, James) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/23 3:56 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20075445 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Gez Agolli. (Attorney James E Doroshow added to party Gez Agolli(pty:pla))(Doroshow, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |