TK Finance, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11375
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11375
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11373 |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
TK Finance, LLC
2500 Takata Dr
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2634 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by TK Finance, LLC. (Steele, Amanda) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by TK Finance, LLC. (Steele, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Takata Americas (9766), Case No. 17-11372 (BLS); TK Finance, LLC (2753), Case No. 17-11373 (BLS); TK China, LLC (1312), Case No. 17-11374 (BLS); TK Holdings Inc. (3416), Case No. 17-11375 (BLS); Takata Protection Systems Inc. (3881), Case No. 17-11376 (BLS); Interiors in Flight Inc. (4046), Case No. 17-11377 (BLS); TK Mexico Inc. (8331), Case No. 17-11378 (BLS); TK Mexico LLC (9029), Case No. 17-11379 (BLS); TK Holdings de Mexico S., de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11380 (BLS); Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11381 (BLS); Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11382 (BLS); and Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11383 (BLS). The docket in Case No. 17-11375 (BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 6/27/2017 (SJS) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 06/26 3:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11373 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8495021, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 06/26 8:13 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA) |
||
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Interiors in Flight Inc., Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK China, LLC, TK Finance, LLC, TK Holdings Inc., TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK Mexico Inc., TK Mexico LLC, Takata Americas, Takata Protection Systems Inc., Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Merchant, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by TK Finance, LLC. (Collins, Mark) |