Takata Protection Systems Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11375
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11375
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11376 |
Case Filed: | Jun 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50,001-100,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Takata Protection Systems Inc.
2500 Takata Dr
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2634 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Final Decree (I) Closing of Certain Subsidiary Cases (II) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 6/10/2020 (LCN) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 06/10 1:19 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Takata Protection Systems Inc.. (Steele, Amanda) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Takata Protection Systems Inc.. (Steele, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Takata Americas (9766), Case No. 17-11372 (BLS); TK Finance, LLC (2753), Case No. 17-11373 (BLS); TK China, LLC (1312), Case No. 17-11374 (BLS); TK Holdings Inc. (3416), Case No. 17-11375 (BLS); Takata Protection Systems Inc. (3881), Case No. 17-11376 (BLS); Interiors in Flight Inc. (4046), Case No. 17-11377 (BLS); TK Mexico Inc. (8331), Case No. 17-11378 (BLS); TK Mexico LLC (9029), Case No. 17-11379 (BLS); TK Holdings de Mexico S., de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11380 (BLS); Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11381 (BLS); Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11382 (BLS); and Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11383 (BLS). The docket in Case No. 17-11375 (BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 6/27/2017 (SJS) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 06/26 3:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11376 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8495021, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 06/26 8:13 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA) |
||
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Interiors in Flight Inc., Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK China, LLC, TK Finance, LLC, TK Holdings Inc., TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK Mexico Inc., TK Mexico LLC, Takata Americas, Takata Protection Systems Inc., Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Merchant, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Takata Protection Systems Inc.. (Collins, Mark) |