Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11375

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-bk-11377
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2017
Terminated:Jun 10, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Interiors in Flight Inc.
2500 Takata Dr
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2634
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
7 7 order Final Decree Wed 06/10 1:18 PM
Final Decree (I) Closing of Certain Subsidiary Cases (II) Granting Related Relief. Signed on 6/10/2020 (LCN)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 06/10 1:18 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/09 10:42 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Interiors in Flight Inc.. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 08/09 10:39 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Interiors in Flight Inc.. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 06/27 2:46 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Takata Americas (9766), Case No. 17-11372 (BLS); TK Finance, LLC (2753), Case No. 17-11373 (BLS); TK China, LLC (1312), Case No. 17-11374 (BLS); TK Holdings Inc. (3416), Case No. 17-11375 (BLS); Takata Protection Systems Inc. (3881), Case No. 17-11376 (BLS); Interiors in Flight Inc. (4046), Case No. 17-11377 (BLS); TK Mexico Inc. (8331), Case No. 17-11378 (BLS); TK Mexico LLC (9029), Case No. 17-11379 (BLS); TK Holdings de Mexico S., de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11380 (BLS); Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11381 (BLS); Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11382 (BLS); and Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11383 (BLS). The docket in Case No. 17-11375 (BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 6/27/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 06/26 3:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11377 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8495021, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 06/26 8:13 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 25, 2017
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Sun 06/25 11:46 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Interiors in Flight Inc., Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK China, LLC, TK Finance, LLC, TK Holdings Inc., TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK Mexico Inc., TK Mexico LLC, Takata Americas, Takata Protection Systems Inc., Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 06/25 7:45 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Interiors in Flight Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]