Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-11375

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-bk-11380
Case Filed:Jun 25, 2017

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors50,001-100,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $10,000,000,001 to $50 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V.

,
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Monday, August 28, 2017
7 7 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Mon 08/28 11:52 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch E-F, , Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. (Notice of Filing of Supplement to Schedule of Assets and Liabilities (Docket No. 478) for TK Holdings de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. 17-11380 ) Filed by TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, August 10, 2017
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 08/10 1:54 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 08/10 1:53 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Haywood, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 06/27 2:46 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Takata Americas (9766), Case No. 17-11372 (BLS); TK Finance, LLC (2753), Case No. 17-11373 (BLS); TK China, LLC (1312), Case No. 17-11374 (BLS); TK Holdings Inc. (3416), Case No. 17-11375 (BLS); Takata Protection Systems Inc. (3881), Case No. 17-11376 (BLS); Interiors in Flight Inc. (4046), Case No. 17-11377 (BLS); TK Mexico Inc. (8331), Case No. 17-11378 (BLS); TK Mexico LLC (9029), Case No. 17-11379 (BLS); TK Holdings de Mexico S., de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11380 (BLS); Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11381 (BLS); Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11382 (BLS); and Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V. (N/A), Case No. 17-11383 (BLS). The docket in Case No. 17-11375 (BLS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 6/27/2017 (SJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 06/26 3:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11380 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8495021, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 06/26 8:13 AM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 25, 2017
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Sun 06/25 11:46 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Industrias Irvin de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Interiors in Flight Inc., Strosshe-Mex, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK China, LLC, TK Finance, LLC, TK Holdings Inc., TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V., TK Mexico Inc., TK Mexico LLC, Takata Americas, Takata Protection Systems Inc., Takata de Mexico, S.A. de C.V.. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sun 06/25 7:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by TK Holdings de Mexico, S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]