Little v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Miller, Jr |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00507 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2020 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 24, 2017 3:22 AM EST |
Defendant
Biomet Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet Manufacturing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet Orthopedics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Biomet US Reconstruction LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles O Little
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
73 | 73
misc
Clerks Judgment
Tue 01/14 1:32 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (jld) |
|
72 | 72
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/14 1:25 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the71 stipulated motion to dismiss and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/14/2020. (jld) |
|
Tuesday, January 07, 2020 | ||
71 | 71
motion
Stipulation to Dismiss
Tue 01/07 2:40 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Russo, Stephanie) |