Advanced Pain Surgery Center, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 0:17-bk-16047
Lead case is: 0:17-bk-16047
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Lori S Simpson |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-18850 |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Aug 07, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 06, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Advanced Pain Surgery Center, LLC
1050 Key Pkwy Ste 103
Frederick, MD 21702-4496 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Greenbelt
6305 Ivy Lane, Suite 600
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Docket last updated: 25 minutes ago |
Sunday, June 03, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 06/04 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 27. Notice Date 06/03/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Consolidate
Fri 06/01 12:13 PM
Order Granting Substantive Consolidation of Bankruptcy Estates 17-18851 17-18850 17-18849 and that all future pleadings to be docketed in LEAD CASE 17-16047 (Johnson, Jean) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
trustee
Non Appointment of Creditors' Committee
Wed 08/16 2:45 PM
Non Appointment of Creditors' Committee. Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
|
trustee
Chapter 11 341 Meeting Report
Wed 08/16 2:44 PM
U.S. Trustee's 341 Meeting Report: The U.S. Trustee hereby reports that the Meeting of Creditors for this case was conducted and concluded by the U.S. Trustee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 341(a)on 8/7/2017. Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/10 1:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 08/10 1:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Appointment of Trustee Examiner
Mon 08/07 10:08 AM
Order Granting Application for Order Approving Appointment of Trustee Examiner Alan M. Grochal, Esquire . (Johnson, Jean) |
|
16 | 16
order
Employ
Mon 08/07 10:05 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Gary R. Greenblatt, Esquir . (Johnson, Jean) |
|
Saturday, July 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sun 07/30 1:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 25. Notice Date 07/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appoint Trustee
Thu 07/27 3:21 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appoint Trustee. Alan M. ^tGrochal added to the case. (Johnson, Jean) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Approving Appointment of Trustee Examiner
Thu 07/27 12:28 PM
Application for Order Approving Appointment of Trustee Examiner Chapter 11 Trustee Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 07/08 12:54 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 07/07/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 07/06 9:32 AM
Certificate of Service of Order Providing for Joint Administration of Cases Filed by Gary R. Greenblatt . (Greenblatt, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 List of All Creditors | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Joint Administration
Wed 07/05 6:12 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration RE: Cases 17-16047 17-18849 17-18850 and 17-18851 The Lead Case is Designated as 17-16047 . (Meany, Tammy) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Employ
Mon 07/03 2:14 PM
Application to Employ Mehlman, Greenblatt & Hare, LLC as Counsel for Debtor in Possession and Verified Statement of Proposed Party Filed by Advanced Pain Surgery Center, LLC. (Greenblatt, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 List of All Creditors | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Gary R. Greenblatt | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appoint Trustee
Mon 07/03 11:25 AM
Motion to Appoint Trustee Filed by Advanced Pain Surgery Center, LLC. (Greenblatt, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 List of All Creditors | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Sunday, July 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 07/03 12:49 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. . No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 07/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 06/30 12:29 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by US Trustee - Greenbelt. (Kohen, Lynn) |
|
court
Case Reassigned
Fri 06/30 12:32 PM
Judge Thomas J. Catliota added to case. Case should have been assigned to Judge Catliota along with related cases. Involvement of Judge Lori S. Simpson Terminated. (Giddings, Betty) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Joint Administration
Thu 06/29 3:03 PM
Emergency Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Advanced Pain Surgery Center, LLC. (Greenblatt, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Thu 06/29 12:22 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-18850 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 30881199. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Thu 06/29 12:19 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Gary R. Greenblatt. (Greenblatt, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
34
pgs
misc
VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 06/29 12:19 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Advanced Pain Surgery Center, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 10/27/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/26/2017.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 07/20/2017 (Greenblatt, Gary) |
|
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Thu 06/29 12:22 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) |