New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:17-cv-04950
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2017
Terminated:Dec 05, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 27, 2017 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Bar Works 7th Avenue, Inc.
Defendant
Bar Works, Inc.
Defendant
Bitcoin Store, Inc.
Defendant
Renwick Haddow
Plaintiff
Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By
Lara Shalov Mehraban
contact info
Andrew Matthew Calamari
contact info
Sandeep Mukund Satwalekar
contact info
Preethi Krishnamurthy
contact info
Christopher John Dunnigan
United States Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
John J. Graubard
contact info
Maureen Peyton King
contact info
Relief Defendant
Bar Works Capital, LLC


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
133 133 order Stipulation and Order Fri 04/25 5:46 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT RENWICK HADDOW: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court's preliminary injunction freezing Haddow's assets. contained in Section II of the Asset Freeze Order (Dkt. No. 35). shall not apply to the Properties. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that Section II of the Asset Freeze Order is hereby modified to permit the Joint Trustees to take possession of, sell, and/or otherwise dispose of the Properties for the benefit of Haddow's U.K. bankruptcy estate. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that. with the exception of this modification. the asset freeze as to Haddow set forth in the Asset Freeze Order remains in full effect. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/25/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
132 132 3 pgs motion Reopen Case Thu 04/24 6:55 PM
LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case in Order to Modify Existing Asset Freeze addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Christopher J. Dunnigan dated 04/24/2025. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Dunnigan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order