Corona vs Washoe County Deputy Sheriff Jason Wood, et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Valerie P Cooke |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00407 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 27, 2017 12:40 AM PST |
Defendant
Francisco Gamboa
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Wood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugenio Enrique Corona
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 08/04 3:29 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 68(A) judgment is hereby entered in favor of Plaintiff, Eugenio Enrique Corona against Defendants, Francisco Gamboa, Jason Wood. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment
Wed 08/02 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Plaintiff Eugenio Enrique Corona.(Busby, Luke) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay
Thu 07/27 3:56 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Francisco Gamboa, Jason Wood. (Gustafson, Jennifer) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Strike
Thu 07/27 3:54 PM
MOTION to Strike9 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Francisco Gamboa, Jason Wood. Responses due by 8/10/2017.(Gustafson, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Declaration
Wed 07/26 11:10 AM
DECLARATION OF SERVICE upon Jason Wood on 07/14/2017 of ECF Nos.5 Summons Issued and1 Complaint. (KW) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/24 3:45 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Francisco Gamboa, Jason Wood. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/7/2017.(Gustafson, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 07/11 12:18 PM
DECLARATION OF SERVICE re ECF No.1 Complaint, ECF No.5 Summons Issued. Francisco Gamboa served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (KR) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 07/06 3:34 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Eugenio Enrique Corona. Responses due by 7/27/2017.(Busby, Luke) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/06 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Enrique Corona re1 Complaint,. Francisco Gamboa served on 7/3/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Busby, Luke) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/06 3:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugenio Enrique Corona re1 Complaint,. Jason Wood served on 7/3/2017, answer due 7/24/2017. (Busby, Luke) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
minord
Minute Order
Mon 07/03 9:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du, on 7/3/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/03 8:12 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Francisco Gamboa, Jason Wood re ECF No.1 Complaint.(KW) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Manual Filing
Fri 06/30 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Manual Filing by Plaintiff Eugenio Enrique Corona re1 Complaint,. Video Clips 2 Video entitled: Ex 1 - Wood Dash Cam Clip.mp4 and Ex2 - Gamboa Dash Cam Clip.mp4 manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Busby, Luke) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Addendum
Fri 06/30 10:47 AM
ADDENDUM to1 Complaint, ; Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff EUGENIO ENRIQUE CORONA.(Busby, Luke) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interested Parties
Fri 06/30 10:40 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by EUGENIO ENRIQUE CORONA. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Busby, Luke) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 06/30 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4673597), filed by EUGENIO ENRIQUE CORONA. Proof of service due by 9/28/2017.(Busby, Luke) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 06/30 10:52 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. (WJ) |