Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Edwin G Torres
Case #: 1:17-cv-22477
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2017
Last checked: Monday Jan 01, 2018 4:16 AM EST
Amicus
Lesley Blackner
340 Royal Poinciana Way Suite 317-377
Palm Beach, FL 33480
Represented By
Lesley Guy Blackner
Blackner Stone & Associates
contact info
Amicus
Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By
Christopher J. Hajec
contact info
Lesley Guy Blackner
Blackner Stone & Associates
contact info
Defendant
Carlos A. Gimenez
Represented By
Michael Beny Valdes
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Miami-Dade County
Represented By
Michael Beny Valdes
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Interested Party
United States Of America
Represented By
Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
U.S. Department Of Justice, Civil Division
contact info
Erez Reuveni
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
Garland Creedle
Represented By
Amien Kacou
American Civil Liberties Union Of Florida
contact info
Ira Jay Kurzban
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Ian K Shaw
Kurzban Kurzban Weinger Tetzeli , Pratt P.A.
contact info
Rebecca Ann Sharpless
University Of Miami School Of Law
contact info
Edward Fortunato Ramos
Kurzban, Kurzban, Weinger, Tetzeli And Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Nancy Gbana Abudu
American Civil Liberties Union Of Florida
contact info

GPO Nov 07 2017
ORDER denying 27 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 11/7/2017. (js02)
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
188 188 order Order on Motion for Substitution of Counsel Wed 02/19 4:45 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting187 Motion for Substitution of Counsel to the extent that it seeks to notice the substitution of attorney Erez Reuveni for attorney Lauren C. Bingham as counsel for United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement and United States Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/19/2025. (kgb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
187 187 motion Substitution of Counsel Fri 02/14 3:39 PM
UNSTIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Erez Reuveni for Lauren Bingham by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Erez Reuveni added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Erez Reuveni added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/28/2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] uveni, Erez