California Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Mendez
Case #: 2:17-cv-01379
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2017
Terminated:Nov 14, 2019
Petitioner
Alex Perez
Respondent
Eric Arnold

GPO Aug 30 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/30/2017 GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Respondent has until 11/7/2017 to file an answer or responsive motion. (Henshaw, R)
GPO Sep 13 2019
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/13/19 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus 1 be denied on the merits. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
GPO Nov 14 2019
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/14/19 ADOPTING 19 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and DECLINING to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2019
21 21 order Judgment Thu 11/14 11:09 AM
JUDGMENT dated *11/14/19* pursuant to order signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/14/19. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs order Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations Thu 11/14 11:09 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/14/19 ADOPTING19 Findings and Recommendations in full; DENYING1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; and DECLINING to issue the certificate of appealability referenced in 28 U.S.C. § 2253. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
19 19 motion Findings and Recommendations Fri 09/13 10:51 AM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 09/13/19 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus1 be denied on the merits. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
18 18 misc Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction Fri 12/22 4:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE (text only): This case is assigned to US District Judge John A. Mendez and US Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The new case number is 2:17-cv-1379 JAM CKD (HC). (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
17 17 misc Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Wed 12/20 3:53 PM
DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Eric Arnold. (Bovarnick, Karen)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge Wed 12/20 3:13 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Alex Perez. (Doyle, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
15 15 misc Reply Tue 11/28 4:18 PM
REPLY by Alex Perez re10 Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Doyle, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension Mon 11/20 1:13 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/17/2017 GRANTING12 Motion for Extension. Petitioner is allowed to file a Reply to Respondent's Answer on or before 11/28/2017. (York, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
13 13 misc Proposed Order Wed 11/15 2:35 PM
PROPOSED ORDER re12 Motion for Extension of time to File Traverse by Alex Perez. (Doyle, John) Modified on 11/15/2017 (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2017
12 12 motion Extension of Time Fri 11/03 12:03 PM
MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to 11/28/2017 by Alex Perez. (Doyle, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
11 11 misc Exhibit Tue 10/24 2:06 PM
EXHIBIT - Notice of Lodging of, and Index to, Exhibits; Exhibits 1-9 by Eric Arnold re10 Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus.(Bovarnick, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (1 of 3),
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 (2 of 3),
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 (3 of 3),
Att: 5 Exhibits 3-9
10 10 answer Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 10/24 1:55 PM
ANSWER to PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Eric Arnold.(Bovarnick, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Answer
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/30 11:21 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/30/2017 GRANTING8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Respondent has until 11/7/2017 to file an answer or responsive motion. (Henshaw, R)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2017
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/25 1:34 PM
MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER or File Responsive Motion by Eric Arnold. Attorney Bovarnick, Karen Z. added.(Bovarnick, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Karen Z. Bovarnick in Support of Enlargement of Time,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, July 10, 2017
7 7 misc Document(s) Served Electronically Mon 07/10 1:15 PM
DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: Petition with Exhibits served on Tami Krenzin pursuant to5 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition. (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
6 6 order 09 - Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment Mon 07/10 1:12 PM
ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/10/2017. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
5 5 order 06 - HC/Order Requiring Respondent to File a Response Mon 07/10 1:11 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/10/2017 DIRECTING respondent to file a response to the petition within 60 days. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order, a copy of the petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Tami Krenzin) (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2017
4 4 misc Exhibit Thu 07/06 1:49 PM
EXHIBIT A, B, C by Alex Perez re1 Complaint.(Doyle, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, C to Petition for writ of Habeas Corpus
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
3 3 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Wed 07/05 3:56 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/7/2017 (Washington, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order re Consent
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/05 2:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Alex Perez (Doyle, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/05 1:59 PM
PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Eric Arnold by Alex Perez. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number (Doyle, John) Modified on 7/5/2017 (Washington, S).
Related: [-]