Samy Jecrois v. Mark Sojak, et al
Original Case: 2:16-cv-01477
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-02426 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Thursday Jun 07, 2018 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
CHONDA ROSARIO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
MARK SOJAK
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
KENNETH KOLICH
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
HONEY SPIRITO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
CHONDA ROSARIO
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
COUNTY OF HUDSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Non-Participating
COUNTY OF HUDSON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
SAMY JECROIS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/07/2018 4:29 AM EDT |
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Kenneth Kolich, Mark Sojak and Honey Spirito in District Court No. 2-16-cv-01477. (KR) |