Gregg Appliances, Inc. et al v. Swann Communications
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robyn L Moberly |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50180 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Swann Communications
12636 Clark Street
Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregg Appliances, Inc.
4151 East 96th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46250 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP c/o Thomas C. Scherer 2700 Market Tower 10 West Market Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion to
Mon 01/08 10:06 AM
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Matthew R. Rous . Attorney for Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 01/05 2:23 PM
Certificate of Service re: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc . (Fowler, Sarah) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Withdraw As Attorney, Motion to
Fri 12/29 11:29 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Roush, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/25 8:58 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50180] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Change of Address, Notice of
Thu 08/24 2:37 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. filed by Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Hokanson, Jeffrey) |
|
court
Judge - Terminate/Add
Thu 08/24 11:00 AM
Judge Robyn L. Moberly terminated. Judge Jeffrey J. Graham assigned. (cmd) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Thu 08/17 2:21 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler, Jeffrey A Hokanson, Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiffs Gregg Appliances, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Roush, Matthew) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Fri 07/07 9:47 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Swann Communications USA Inc . (Fowler, Sarah) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Thu 07/06 2:06 PM
Appearance filed by Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Roush, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Thu 07/06 9:51 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 07/20/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 8/7/2017. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Wed 07/05 5:10 PM
Appearance filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Fowler, Sarah) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Wed 07/05 4:05 PM
Appearance filed by Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Hokanson, Jeffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/05 4:01 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50180 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Gregg Appliances, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Swann Communications [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Hokanson, Jeffrey) |