Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robyn L Moberly
Case #: 1:17-ap-50181
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2017
Terminated:Sep 11, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Belkin International, Inc.
160 Greentree Dr., Suite 101
Dover, DE 19904
Represented By
Belkin International, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregg Appliances, Inc.
4151 East 96th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46250
Represented By
Jeffrey A Hokanson
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Sarah Lynn Fowler
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Matthew Robert Roush
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
2700 Market Tower 10 West Market Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Jeffrey A Hokanson
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, June 01, 2018
20 20 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 06/01 2:31 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc Related [+]. (Hokanson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, January 08, 2018
19 19 order Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion to Mon 01/08 10:09 AM
Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Matthew R. Roush Related [+]. Attorney for Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. must distribute this order. (lat)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, January 05, 2018
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Fri 01/05 2:31 PM
Certificate of Service re: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc Related [+]. (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, December 29, 2017
17 17 motion Withdraw As Attorney, Motion to Fri 12/29 11:41 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Roush, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2017
16 16 court Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 09/11 2:07 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50181] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 27, 2017
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Mon 08/28 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 08/27/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Friday, August 25, 2017
14 14 order Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Fri 08/25 10:52 AM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Belkin International, Inc Related [+]. Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, August 24, 2017
13 13 notice Change of Address, Notice of Thu 08/24 2:39 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. filed by Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Hokanson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
court Judge - Terminate/Add Thu 08/24 11:00 AM
Judge Robyn L. Moberly terminated. Judge Jeffrey J. Graham assigned. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2017
12 12 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Tue 08/22 1:50 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler, Jeffrey A Hokanson, Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiffs Gregg Appliances, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Roush, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 08/22 7:49 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Belkin International, Inc Related [+]. (cmd)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, August 21, 2017
10 10 misc Affidavit Mon 08/21 2:13 PM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc Related [+]. (Roush, Matthew)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 misc Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of Mon 08/21 2:07 PM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler, Jeffrey A Hokanson, Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiffs Gregg Appliances, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Roush, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
8 8 notice Appearance Thu 08/17 5:01 PM
Appearance filed by Whitney L Mosby on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Mosby, Whitney)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Thu 08/17 4:57 PM
Appearance filed by Thomas C Scherer on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Scherer, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Fri 07/07 9:45 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Belkin International, Inc Related [+]. (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-] 4
Thursday, July 06, 2017
5 5 notice Appearance Thu 07/06 2:07 PM
Appearance filed by Matthew Robert Roush on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Roush, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Thu 07/06 9:54 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 07/20/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 8/7/2017. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2017
3 3 notice Appearance Wed 07/05 5:48 PM
Appearance filed by Sarah Lynn Fowler on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Fowler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Wed 07/05 5:46 PM
Appearance filed by Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Appliances, Inc. (Hokanson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/05 5:36 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50181 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Gregg Appliances, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Belkin International, Inc. [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Hokanson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]