Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 1:17-cv-02497
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2017
Terminated:Nov 28, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2017 4:01 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Selective Way Insurance Company
Represented By
Gillian Shannon Crowl
Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP
contact info
Michael Hilliard Schroder
Swift, Currie, Mcghee & Hiers, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc.
Represented By
Michael B. Weinstein
Mbw Law, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
GenLan Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Michael B. Weinstein
Mbw Law, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Selective Way Insurance Company
Represented By
Gillian Shannon Crowl
Gray Rust St. Amand Moffett & Brieske, LLP
contact info
Michael Hilliard Schroder
Swift, Currie, Mcghee & Hiers, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc.
Represented By
Michael B. Weinstein
Mbw Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GenLan Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Michael B. Weinstein
Mbw Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, November 28, 2018
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 11/28 9:48 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING20 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to all of the parties' claims and counterclaims pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (jlm)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/28 9:50 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 27, 2018
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/27 4:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Selective Way Insurance Company. (Schroder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 15, 2018
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 06/15 11:15 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 9/28/2018. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 6/15/18. (rsh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/14 4:41 PM
NOTICE by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC Joint Consent To Extend Discovery (Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 16, 2018
17 17 service Certificate of Service Mon 04/16 3:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Selective Way Insurance Company Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service (Schroder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Mon 02/26 9:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC.(Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Certificate of Service Mon 02/26 9:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC.(Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
14 14 misc Leave of Absence Fri 01/05 4:07 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 2/15/18-2/21/18, 2/26/18-3/2/18, 5/18/18-5/24/18, 7/29/18-8/5/18, 10/17/18-10/19/18, by Michael Hilliard Schroder. (Schroder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 01/03 1:29 PM
ANSWER to11 Amended Complaint by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Crowl, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
12 12 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/02 11:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/2/2018. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 1/2/18. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 12/20 10:32 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc.with Jury Demand, filed by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc..(Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
10 10 order Guidelines for Discovery and Motion Practice Thu 12/07 3:06 PM
Instructions to Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 12/7/17. (rsh)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 12/07 12:45 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC, GenLan Holdings, LLC. (Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 12/07 3:57 PM
Clerks Notation re8 Corporate Disclosure Statement: reviewed and approved by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (se)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2017
8 8 discov Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/02 5:02 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Way Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Way Insurance Company, Selective Way Insurance Company by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Crowl, Gillian)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 10/02 4:49 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 3/1/2018.), COUNTERCLAIM against Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC with Jury Demand by Selective Way Insurance Company.(Crowl, Gillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Part 1),
Att: 2 Exhibit A (Part 2),
Att: 3 Exhibit A (Part 3),
Att: 4 Exhibit A (Part 4),
Att: 5 Exhibit A (Part 5),
Att: 6 Exhibit A (Part 6),
Att: 7 Exhibit A (Part 7),
Att: 8 Exhibit A (Part 8),
Att: 9 Exhibit A (Part 9),
Att: 10 Exhibit A (Part 10),
Att: 11 Exhibit A (Part 11)
Friday, August 11, 2017
6 6 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 08/11 2:29 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC.(Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
Wednesday, August 02, 2017
5 5 respm Response (Non-Motion) Wed 08/02 7:50 PM
RESPONSE re3 Order to Show Cause filed by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC.(Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, July 31, 2017
4 4 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 07/31 11:31 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc., GenLan Holdings, LLC. Selective Way Insurance Company served on 7/31/2017. (Weinstein, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
3 3 order Order to Show Cause Thu 07/20 3:33 PM
ORDER that plaintiff respond in writing by 8/3/17 to SHOW CAUSE that the complete diversity requirement of 28:1332 is satisfied. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr on 7/20/17. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2017
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 07/06 1:27 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Selective Way Insurance Company. (adg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/06 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alcue Properties and Interiors, Inc. and GenLan Holdings, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7243159)(adg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet