Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert H Cleland
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:17-cv-12224
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jul 07, 2017
Terminated:Oct 16, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 03, 2018 4:25 AM EST
Defendant
John Neff
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Mayer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Thomas G. Pasternak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Linda Shinpaugh
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Mayer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Thomas G. Pasternak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Thune
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Mayer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Thomas G. Pasternak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jenna Uribe
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Mayer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Thomas G. Pasternak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Wolfe Financial, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Mayer
Akerman LLP
contact info
Thomas G. Pasternak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Success Mortgage Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Mark E. Merlanti
Finkel Whitefield Selik
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 16, 2017
17 17 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Mon 10/16 11:57 AM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2017
16 16 motion Motion - Free Mon 10/02 3:07 PM
Joint MOTION ENTRY OF A CONSENT ORDER by Success Mortgage Partners, Inc.. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Mon 10/02 3:55 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Status Conference on 10/3/2017 is Cancelled. Case has settled (LWag)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2017
15 15 notice Appear* Mon 09/25 10:30 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Status Conference set for 10/3/2017 02:30 PM before District Judge Robert H. Cleland at the US District Courtroom 252, Detroit, MI (LWag)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2017
14 14 petition Request - other Fri 09/15 5:02 PM
REQUEST for Status Conference by Success Mortgage Partners, Inc.. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
13 13 notice Appearance Fri 07/21 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Pasternak on behalf of All Defendants. (Pasternak, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2017
12 12 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Thu 07/20 5:03 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants (Mayer, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
11 11 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/19 8:16 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jenna Uribe served on 7/12/2017, answer due 8/2/2017. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/19 8:14 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Jeff Thune served on 7/11/2017, answer due 8/1/2017. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/19 8:13 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. John Neff served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/19 8:12 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Linda Shinpaugh served on 7/18/2017, answer due 8/8/2017. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/19 8:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wolfe Financial, Inc. served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2017
6 6 notice Appearance Fri 07/14 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Mayer on behalf of All Defendants. (Mayer, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
5 5 order Order Thu 07/13 2:39 PM
ORDER DENYING IN PART3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Success Mortgage Partners, Inc., and DIRECTING Plaintiff to serve Defendant on or before July 19, 2017. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (LWag)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued* Fri 07/07 12:35 PM
SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (DWor)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 07/07 11:11 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Success Mortgage Partners, Inc.. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 07/07 11:05 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Success Mortgage Partners, Inc. (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 07/07 11:02 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Success Mortgage Partners, Inc. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6299147 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Merlanti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 07/07 12:36 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DWor)
Related: [-]