Manchester-Anika, LLC
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Daniel S Oppermanbaycity |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-49958 |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 07, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Manchester Anika, LLC
6632 Telegraph Road, Suite 350
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Anika, LLC
6632 Telegraph Road, Suite 350
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48301 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jul 14, 2017 12:46 PM EDT |
Creditor
BC33, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 34 seconds ago |
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
order
Final Decree and Case Closed
Thu 12/07 2:28 PM
Final Decree: The bankruptcy estate has been fully administered. The bankruptcy court has decreed the chapter 11 case is closed. (ADI: MMS) |
||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
48 | 48
misc
Declaration
Wed 12/06 3:22 PM
Declaration U.S. Trustee's Notice of Compliance Filed by U.S. Trustee Daniel M. McDermott . (Roble (UST), Richard) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
47 | 47
order
Compensation
Thu 11/30 4:02 PM
Order Awarding Fees and Expenses in Connection with First and Final Fee Application of Applicant. for Robert N. Bassel, Fees Awarded: $888.00, Expenses Awarded: $0.00. (MMS) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
misc
Certification of Non-Response
Tue 11/28 12:32 PM
Certification of Non-Response Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC . (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
order
Employ
Mon 11/13 10:29 AM
Order Granting Application of the Debtor to Employ Bankruptcy Counsel . (Clark, J) |
|
44 | 44
misc
Concurrence
Mon 11/13 7:42 AM
Concurrence Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC . (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Sunday, October 01, 2017 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Monthly Income & Expense Statement
Sun 10/01 4:05 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for September 2017 until dismissal Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Compensation
Tue 09/26 10:42 PM
Application for Compensation for Robert N. Bassel, Debtor's Attorney, Period: 8/25/2017 to 9/12/2017, Fee: $888, Expenses: $0. Filed by Attorney Robert N. Bassel (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Monthly Income & Expense Statement
Fri 09/22 12:27 PM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for August 2017 Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
40 | 40
misc
Monthly Income & Expense Statement
Fri 09/22 9:12 AM
Monthly Income & Expense Statement for July 2017 Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
court
Notice of Dismissal with BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 09/15 1:25 AM
Notice of Dismissal with BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 09/14/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
court
Minute Entry. Case Dismissed
Wed 09/13 8:33 AM
Minute Entry. Case Dismissed. Initial Scheduling Conference cancelled. (Erickson, Wendy) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
order
Dismiss Case
Tue 09/12 4:39 PM
Order Dismissing Proceeding Due to Failure to Provide Information to U.S. Trustee as to Debtor , . (kel) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Certification of Non-Response
Tue 09/12 9:23 AM
Certification of Non-Response Filed by U.S. Trustee Daniel M. McDermott . (Roble (UST), Richard) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Employ
Fri 08/25 11:21 PM
Application to Employ Robert Bassel as Debtor's Counsel Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/18 3:28 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. Trustee Daniel M. McDermott . (Roble (UST), Richard) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Cont/Resch/Adj
Fri 08/18 3:26 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Adjourned to September 14, 2017 @ 11:00 a.m. and the Initial Status Conference will take place on September 14, 2017 @ 1:00 p.m. noticed by U.S. Trustee Daniel M. McDermott. (Roble (UST), Richard) |
|
33 | 33
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 08/18 3:23 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case Re: Cause Filed by U.S. Trustee Daniel M. McDermott. (Roble (UST), Richard) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/18 2:37 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC . (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Striking Document (text)
Tue 08/15 9:31 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF has been filed in the incorrect case . So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman (Erickson, Wendy) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/14 7:04 AM
Corrected Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC . (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
List of Equity Security Holders
Mon 08/07 7:07 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Assets - Real and Personal Property for Non-Individual , Statement of Financial Affairs Assets - Real and Personal Property , Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) , Schedule H: Assets - Real and Personal Property , Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims , Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property , Schedule A/B: Assets - Real and Personal Property , List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
28 | 28
misc
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors
Mon 08/07 6:45 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/03 11:00 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC . (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Tue 08/01 9:49 AM
Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
25 | 25
order
Striking Document (text)
Tue 08/01 8:19 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FOR NON-INDIVIDUAL DEBTORS NOT ATTACHED, and STATEMENT OF CORPORATE OWNERSHIP MUST BE FILED AS A SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY . So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman (Erickson, Wendy) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Striking Document (text)
Mon 07/31 9:31 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF has been filed in the incorrect case . So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman (Erickson, Wendy) |
|
Sunday, July 30, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors
Sun 07/30 9:10 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors , Statement of Financial Affairs Assets - Real and Personal Property , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Assets - Real and Personal Property for Non-Individual , Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) Pursuant to F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) , List of Equity Security Holders , Statement of Corporate Ownership , Schedule H: Assets - Real and Personal Property , Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims , Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property , Schedule A/B: Assets - Real and Personal Property Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Fri 07/28 10:53 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor In Possession Manchester-Anika, LLC (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Striking Document (text)
Thu 07/27 4:19 PM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because The list of the 20 largest creditors cannot be filed with a cover sheet for amendments. The list of 20 largest creditors has its own event code and must be filed using that code, without a cover sheet for amendments. . So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman (Erickson, Wendy) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Thu 07/27 12:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/26/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements
Tue 07/25 7:03 AM
Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements filed Re: List of Creditors Filed by Debtor In Possession Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules
Tue 07/25 6:50 AM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Debtor In Possession Anika, LLC (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements
Mon 07/24 6:16 PM
Cover Sheet for Amendments to Schedules and or Statements filed Re: Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy, Filed by Debtor In Possession Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
16 | 16
court
341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign
Mon 07/24 2:22 PM
341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign and Request to BNC for Issuance of First Meeting of Creditors. (nlt) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Ch. 11 Status Conference
Thu 07/20 3:04 PM
Order For Initial Chapter 11 Status Conference. Status Conference to be held on 8/25/2017 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom, Bay City, 111 First St. (kcm) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wed 07/19 7:33 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Bankruptcy Cover Sheet
Wed 07/19 7:31 AM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Anika, LLC . (Bassel, Robert) |
|
Sunday, July 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 07/17 12:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/16/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Business)
Fri 07/14 2:43 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/25/2017 at 11:00 AM at Room 103, 101 First St., Bay City 341. Proofs of Claims due by 11/24/2017. (H, Laura) |
|
10 | 10
order
Striking Document - Initial Documents (7 Days)
Fri 07/14 11:34 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the Debtor's name was incorrectly stated on the PDF. A corrected document is required to be filed, in its entirety, within 7 days of this Order. If the corrected document(s) are not timely filed, the Court may enter an Order dismissing the case without a hearing. . So Ordered by /s/ Judge Daniel S. Opperman Corrected Pleading Due on 7/21/2017.(Skillman, Pamela) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/14 11:07 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor BC33, LLC . (Kitei, Scott) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/14 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
7 | 7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 07/14 1:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/13/2017. (Admin.) |
|
6 | 6
court
Deficiency Notice (BK)
Thu 07/13 10:08 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service is Non-Compliant as it does not contain a case caption or case number. Proof of Service Due on 7/20/2017. (Skillman, Pamela) |
|
5 | 5
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Thu 07/13 7:54 AM
Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor In Possession Anika, LLC. (Bassel, Robert) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 07/13 7:52 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-49958 [misc,volp11] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 29997381, amount . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/12 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers Filed by Creditor BC33, LLC. (Kitei, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice of Missing Documents
Tue 07/11 11:16 AM
Notice of Missing Documents List of Equity Security Holders due 7/24/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 7/24/2017. (ckata) |
|
2 | 2
court
Deficiency Notice (BK)
Tue 07/11 10:06 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Acceptable List of Creditors Not Uploaded, Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Missing or Non-Compliant, and Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Acceptable List of Creditors Not Uploaded due by 7/18/2017. Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Missing or Non-Compliant due on 7/18/2017. Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 7/18/2017. (ckata) |
|
court
Flags Set CASECHECKED
Tue 07/11 11:17 AM
Flags Set CASECHECKED. (ckata) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 07/10 9:15 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Manchester Anika, LLC Schedules A-J due 07/24/2017. Statement of Attorney for Debtor(s) F.R.Bankr.P.2016(b) due 07/24/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/24/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 07/24/2017. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/7/2017. Disclosure Statement due by 11/7/2017. (Bassel, Robert) |