Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Robert Holmes Bell
Case #: 1:14-cv-00007
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2014
Terminated:Jan 06, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 2:35 PM EST
defendant
John Does # 1-5
defendant
mike weber
defendant
Unknown Part(y)(ies)
defendant
Mike Webber
plaintiff
Plastipack Packaging Inc.
Represented By
Michael P. Pieknik
The Liedel Law Group
contact info
plaintiff
Plasticpack Packaging, Inc.
Represented By
Michael P. Pieknik
The Liedel Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, January 06, 2015
19 19 order Order Dismissing Case (no motion) Tue 01/06 8:40 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: no response received after the Court issued a second order to show cause ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 11, 2014
18 18 order Order to Show Cause (Deadline) Thu 12/11 3:39 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall respond to this second show cause order by 12/18/2014, or this matter will be dismissed ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 30, 2014
17 17 EXHIBIT re16 EX #1 OF VERIFIED PETITION by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc. (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 PETITION VERIFIED PETITION REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS in response to court notice; (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc. Service of Subpoena dated 5/20/2014 on Dropbox (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc. Service of subpoena dated 5/20/2014 on Google (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc. Service of Subpoena dated 4/3/2014 on Dropbox (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc. Service of Subpoena dated 4/3/2014 on Google (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2014
11 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 5/30/2014 why the case should not be dismissed as to defendant Mike Webber ; signed by Judge Robert Holmes Bell (Judge Robert Holmes Bell, kcb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2014
10 10 ORDER granting9 plf's second motion for discovery; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 16, 2014
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING SECOND MOTION for discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference 9 to Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A)(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2014
9 9 SECOND MOTION for discovery Prior to Rule 26 Conference by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc.;(Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1 - CV of Scott Sutton,
Att: 2 Exhibit #2 - Affidavit of G. Jewitt,
Att: 3 Exhibit #3 - Affidavit of S. Sutton,
Att: 4 Exhibit #4 - Data preservation request,
Att: 5 Exhibit #5 - E-mail from Google Legal
Tuesday, February 18, 2014
8 8 ORDER granting6 plf's motion to seal exhibit [6-2]; dismissing7 motion to strike6 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2014
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to strike Ex #2 of Docket #6 7 to Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A)(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2014
7 7 MOTION to Strike or Seal Exhibit 2 of Document 6 by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc. (Pieknik, Michael) Modified text on 2/14/2014 (pjw)
Related: [-]
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT 6 to Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A)(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2014
6 6 MOTION to SEAL DOCUMENT by plaintiff Plasticpack Packaging, Inc.;(Pieknik, Michael) Modified text on 2/13/2014 (pjw) Modified text on 2/18/2014 to seal exhibit 2 per order8 (jlg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 SEALED Exhibit 2
Thursday, January 09, 2014
5 5 ORDER denying3 plf's motion for expedited discovery; signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville (Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville, mmh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2014
4 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Robert Holmes Bell (kvt)
Related: [-]
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Unknown Part(y)(ies), Mike Webber ; none provided (kvt)
Related: [-]
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for discovery prior to rule 26 conference 3 to Magistrate Judge Joseph G. Scoville pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A)(Judge Robert Holmes Bell, sdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2014
RECEIPT: Filing fee in the amount of $400.00 paid by Michael P. Pieknik, receipt number 0646-2773463; (ns)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2014
3 3 MOTION for discovery prior to rule 26 conference by plaintiff Plastipack Packaging Inc.; (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plastipack Packaging Inc. (Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against John Does # 1-5, mike weber filed by Plastipack Packaging Inc.(Pieknik, Michael)
Related: [-]