Hernandez v. Berryhill
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | William B Carter |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-06453 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/19 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Pruett on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Pruett, Richard) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
order
Stipulation and Order
Mon 01/28 12:09 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $6,760.89 pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. Signed by Magistrate Judge William B. Carter on 1/28/19. (TF) |
|
Friday, January 25, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/25 5:46 PM
STIPULATION re24 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act 28 U.S.C.A. § 2412 ,25 Affirmation,, by Danielle Marie Hernandez. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Affirmation
Thu 01/24 1:10 PM
AFFIRMATION signed by Howard D. Olinsky re24 First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act 28 U.S.C.A. § 2412 filed by Danielle Marie Hernandez filed by Danielle Marie Hernandez.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-CPI Table, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-All Professional Time, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Attorney Time, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Paralegal Time, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Expenses, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Affirmation and Waive of Direct Payment of EAJA Fees, | ||
Att: 7 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service | ||
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Thu 01/24 12:53 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act 28 U.S.C.A. § 2412 by Danielle Marie Hernandez.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Mon 10/29 11:16 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Danielle Marie Hernandez against Commissioner. Signed by Clerk of Court on 10/29/18. (TF) |
|
22 | 22
15
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Mon 10/29 11:05 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's9 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying Defendant's14 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. This matter is REMANDED to Defendant, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), for further proceedings consistent with this Decision and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William B. Carter on 10/29/18. (TF) |
|
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/14 11:14 AM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William B. Carter. Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman no longer assigned to the case. (LB) |
||
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Text Order
Tue 06/12 9:58 AM
TEXT ORDER Oral Argument before the undersigned is CANCELLED. The case will be reassigned. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 6/12/2018. (MAH) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/24 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Palmer on behalf of Danielle Marie Hernandez (Palmer, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/26 3:15 PM
ORDER granting the Commissioner's request to appear by telephone for oral argument on 6/13/2018 at 2:00PM. Counsel for the Commissioner is directed to call chambers on the day of the argument. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 4/26/2018. (MAH) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/25 8:56 AM
TEXT ORDER Oral Argument rescheduled for 6/13/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 4/25/2018. (MAH) |
|
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn
Wed 04/25 8:54 AM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Adjourn. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 4/24/2018. (MAH) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply/Response
Wed 04/18 2:17 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Certificate of Service filed by Danielle Marie Hernandez. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Adjourn
Tue 04/17 2:33 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Oral Argument by Danielle Marie Hernandez.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 03/20 6:55 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Nancy A. Berryhill.(Myers, David) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Text Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 02/13 2:35 PM
TEXT ORDER re12 : Pursuant to Commissioner's February 13 letter, Responses due by 3/28/2018. Replies, if any, due by 4/18/2018. Oral argument remains scheduled for 5/30/2018 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/13/2018. (BJJ) (BJJ) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 02/12 1:29 PM
ORDER re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings: Responses due by 2/26/2018. Replies due by 3/19/2018. Oral Argument set for 5/30/2018 02:00 PM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/12/2018. (BJJ) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Fri 02/09 2:57 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Nancy A. Berryhill, Danielle Marie Hernandez. Case reassigned to Magistrate Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/8/18. (TF) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 12/26 4:13 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Danielle Marie Hernandez.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
9 | 9
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 12/26 4:12 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Danielle Marie Hernandez.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Transcript (Social Security)
Fri 10/27 1:03 PM
TRANSCRIPT (Social Security) . (Smith, Kathryn) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 10/27 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn L. Smith on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Smith, Kathryn) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/27 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Brent Myers on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Myers, David) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 08/25 4:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danielle Marie Hernandez. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/23/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. (Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 07/14 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (TF) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/13 9:52 AM
DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/13/17. (SCE) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/12 12:55 PM
Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/12 12:55 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF) |
||
utility
Social Security Standby Magistrate
Wed 07/12 12:59 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of case assignment. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Feldman. (TF) |
||
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/11 2:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danielle Marie Hernandez.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/11 2:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Danielle Marie Hernandez.(Olinsky, Howard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |