Acosta v. Woo Lae Oak Food Group, LLC et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | Michael S Nachmanoff |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00785 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 06, 2018 5:27 AM EST |
Defendant
Hang Nam Paik
|
|
Defendant
Kyung Hee Paik
|
|
Defendant
Woo Lae Oak Food Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
R. Alexander Acosta
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment - Consent
Mon 02/26 1:30 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of R. Alexander Acosta against Woo Lae Oak Food Group, LLC, Hang Nam Paik, Kyung Hee Paik. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/26/2018. (See order for further details). (acha, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 02/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE by R. Alexander Acosta of Filing Consent Judgment(Beydoun, Ali) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Order (send NEF to 4th Circuit)
Fri 12/01 5:08 PM
ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the Order of November 29, 2017 [Dkt.No. I 1] be and is VA CA TED, and it is further ORDERED that on or before February 20, 2018 plaintiff file the Consent Judgment discussed in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/1/17. (gwalk, ) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Settlement (by Attorney)
Fri 12/01 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by R. Alexander Acosta (Beydoun, Ali) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Vacate
Fri 12/01 3:24 PM
MOTION to Vacate11 Order,, by R. Alexander Acosta.(Beydoun, Ali) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/29 5:12 PM
ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff immediately obtain entries of default from the Clerk pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), and it is further ORDERED that promptly after obtaining the entries of default, plaintiff file a motion for default judgment and an accompanying memorandum, and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff file a Notice setting the hearing of the motion for default judgment for 10:00 a.m. on Friday, January 5, 2018, before the magistrate judge to whom this action is referred. See order for further details. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/29/2017. (acha, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 10/04 5:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Woo Lae Oak Food Group, LLC; waiver sent on 9/19/2017, answer due 11/20/2017. (pmil, ) |
|
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 10/04 5:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kyung Hee Paik; waiver sent on 9/19/2017, answer due 11/20/2017. (pmil, ) |
|
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 10/04 5:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hang Nam Paik; waiver sent on 9/19/2017, answer due 11/20/2017. (pmil, ) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Waiver of
Thu 09/28 11:26 AM
Waiver of re1 Complaint Service of Defendant Kyung Paik by R. Alexander Acosta (Beydoun, Ali) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Waiver of
Thu 09/28 11:25 AM
Waiver of re1 Complaint Service of Defendant Hang Paik by R. Alexander Acosta (Beydoun, Ali) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Waiver of
Thu 09/28 10:01 AM
Waiver of re1 Complaint Service of Defendant Woo Lae Oak Food Group, LLC by R. Alexander Acosta (Beydoun, Ali) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/20 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Abed Beydoun on behalf of R. Alexander Acosta (Beydoun, Ali) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Thu 09/07 3:03 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/07/17. (pmil, ) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Thu 09/07 11:47 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Leah A. Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Ali A. Beydoun by R. Alexander Acosta. (Beydoun, Ali) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/11 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Hang Nam Paik, Kyung Hee Paik, Woo Lae Oak Food Group, LLC, filed by R. Alexander Acosta.(acha, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |