|
GPO
Jan 04 2018
ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 01/04/2018, re: 26 defendant Hirschfeld's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings is DENIED. ORDERED that, within fourteen days of this Order, defendant Hirschfeld shall file an answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand 24. ORDERED that, within seven days of this Order, defendants shall file responses to Plaintiff's Amended Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Preliminary Injunction 25. ORDERED that, within seven days of this Order, each party shall file a list of witnesses expected to testify at the preliminary injunction hearing, along with the estimated length of the witness testimony. ORDERED that defendant Hirschfeld's request for costs and attorney's fees is DENIED. (sphil, ) Modified on 1/5/2018 to correct docket text. (sphil, ).
|
|
GPO
Mar 02 2018
ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/02/2018, re: 25 Plaintiff's Amended Motion and Supporting Memorandum for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. ORDERED that individual defendants' request for reasonable attorney's fees and costs, Docket No. 42 at 11, is DENIED. (sphil, )
|
|
GPO
Nov 06 2018
ORDER granting 72 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall accept Plaintiffs proposed Second Amended Complaint [#72-1] for filing as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the newly-named Defendants shall be served in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Scheduling Conference reset for 12/13/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a proposed Scheduling Order shall be filed no later than 12/6/2018, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/6/2018. (jgonz, )
|
|
GPO
Aug 19 2019
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/19/19. 142 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Criminal Proceeding is GRANTED to the extent that this matter is STAYED as to discovery through September 18, 2019. Status Report due by 9/11/2019.(lgale, )
|
|
GPO
Sep 25 2019
plaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that all claims against defendant Ally Energy Services, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that plaintiff's Fourth, Fifth, Seventh, Ninth, Twelfth, and FouORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/25/2019, re: 103 defendant Ally Energy Services, Inc. Motion to Dismiss and Opening Brief is GRANTED; 113 defendants Craig Hirschfeld and Joseph Johnson's Motion toDismiss Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; 114 defendant Katie Stromstads Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; 115 defendant Ross Rhinehart's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Comrteenth Claims against defendant Craig Hirschfeld are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that plaintiff's Fourth, Fifth, Seventh, Twelfth, and Fourteenth Claims against defendant Joseph Johnson are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that plaintiff's Second, Third, Ninth, Twelfth, and Fourteenth Claims against defendant Katie Stromstad are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that plaintiff's Fifth, Tenth, Twelfth, and Fourteenth Claims against defendant Ross Rhinehart are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. (sphil, )
|
|
GPO
Oct 29 2019
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/29/19 DENYING 155 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Protective Order.(nmarb, )
|
|
GPO
Mar 23 2020
PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim.(sphil, )ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/23/2020, re: 134 Adam Hirschfeld's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. ORDERED that plaintiff's Twelfth Claim is DISMISSED WITH
|