Castillo-Antonio v. Singh & Kaur Enterprises, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03974 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 10, 2018 1:17 AM PST |
Defendant
William A. McMaster
|
|
Defendant
Singh & Kaur Enterprises, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Remark
Mon 09/25 4:13 PM
Case closed. See8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Case. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/25 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 9/25/2017) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/02 4:20 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Daniel Castillo-Antonio.. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 8/2/2017) |
|
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 08/02 3:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2017 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/18 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to William A. McMaster, Singh & Kaur Enterprises, Inc.. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017) |
|
4 | 4
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Tue 07/18 3:02 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/14 2:26 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2017. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 07/14 1:29 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 7/14/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/14 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11547555.). Filed byJose Daniel Castillo-Antonio.(Mac Bride, Richard) (Filed on 7/14/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |