New York Northern District Court
Judge:Frederick J Scullin, Jr
Referred: David E Peebles
Case #: 5:17-cv-00774
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 American Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2017
Terminated:Apr 02, 2018
Last checked: Friday Jan 12, 2018 3:38 AM EST
Defendant
Suit-Kote Corporation
Represented By
Brian J. Butler
Bond Schoeneck & King, Pllc - Syracuse
contact info
Andrew D. Bobrek
Bond Schoeneck & King, Pllc - Syracuse
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Knickerbocker
Represented By
Seth J. Peacock
Office Of Seth J. Peacock
contact info


Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago
Monday, April 02, 2018
22 22 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 04/02 5:52 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice and without costs or fees. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 4/2/2018. (bjw, )
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/02 2:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Suit-Kote Corporation submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr.. (Bobrek, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 19, 2018
20 20 order Order Mon 03/19 1:26 PM
TEXT ORDER : The telephone conference set for 3/22/2018 at 10:00 AM is adjourned without date. The deadlines in this action remain stayed and the parties are still required to file either a status report or a stipulation of dismissal on or before 4/2/2018. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 3/19/2018. (sal)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2018
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 03/05 12:11 PM
TEXT ORDER : Based upon the18 Status Report, the parties are directed to either file a further joint status report or a stipulation of dismissal on or before 4/2/2018. The deadlines in this action remain stayed at this time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 3/5/2018. (sal )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 03/02 3:36 PM
STATUS REPORT by Suit-Kote Corporation. (Bobrek, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
17 17 order Order Thu 02/01 11:06 AM
TEXT ORDER: Based upon the16 Status Report, this case has tentatively settled. The deadlines in this action are STAYED at this time. The parties are directed to either file a further joint status report or a stipulation of dismissal on or before 3/2/2018. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 2/1/2018. (sal )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
16 16 misc Status Report Wed 01/31 4:08 PM
STATUS REPORT to advise the Court that the parties have reached a private settlement in principle, resolving this case by Suit-Kote Corporation. (Bobrek, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
15 15 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Thu 12/14 11:59 AM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of jury trial: 3-5 days. Preferred Trial Location: Syracuse. Joinder of Parties due by 1/31/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 1/31/2018. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 2/28/2018. Completion of all Discovery due by 9/30/2018. Dispositive Motions must be filed by 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 12/14/2017. (sal )
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Thu 12/14 11:41 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 1/11/2018. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 2/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 12/14/2017. (sal )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 12/14 10:43 AM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/14/2017. Mandatory disclosures have been exchanged. Initial written discovery demands will be served by 1/31/2018. Joinder and amendment deadlines are set for 1/31/2018. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is set for 2/28/2018. Completion of Discovery is due by 9/30/2018. Dispositive motions must be filed by 11/30/2018. This will be a jury trial expected to last 3-5 days in Syracuse. Next telephone conference is set for 3/22/2018 at 10:00 AM. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call to Chambers. APP: Seth Peacock, Esq. and Brian Butler, Esq. (sal )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 12/14 11:38 AM
Set Hearings: A Telephone Conference is set for 3/22/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call to Chambers, which can be reached at (315) 234-8620. (sal )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
13 13 misc Civil Case Management Plan Wed 12/06 3:25 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Suit-Kote Corporation. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/04 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D. Bobrek on behalf of Suit-Kote Corporation (Bobrek, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
11 11 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 12/01 9:16 AM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suit-Kote Corporation. (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate of Service Fri 12/01 9:13 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Suit-Kote Corporation re9 Answer to Complaint (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/01 9:12 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Suit-Kote Corporation.(Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
8 8 order Order on Letter Request Thu 10/19 1:59 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Letter Request for an extension of time for defendant Suit-Kote Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before 12/1/2017. The IN PERSON Initial Conference set for 12/14/2017 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse, 10th floor, before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/7/2017. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 10/19/2017. (sal )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
7 7 motion Letter Request/Motion Wed 10/18 12:02 PM
Letter Motion from Brian J. Butler, Esq. for Suit-Kote Corporation requesting that Stipulation to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint be "So Ordered" submitted to Judge Peebles . (Butler, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2017
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 10/06 10:18 AM
***Answer due date updated for Suit-Kote Corporation answer due 10/25/2017. (sal )
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 10/06 10:22 AM
Reset Deadlines/Hearings: The IN PERSON Initial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled for 11/9/2017 at 10:30 AM in Syracuse, 10th floor, before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/2/2017. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.). Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for advising defendant's counsel of this change once he/she formally appears in this matter. (sal )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2017
6 6 misc Status Report Thu 10/05 2:03 PM
STATUS REPORT by Brian Knickerbocker. (Peacock, Seth)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Thu 10/05 1:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian Knickerbocker (Peacock, Seth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2017
4 4 order Order Tue 10/03 12:09 PM
TEXT ORDER : According to the docket sheet, summonses were issued by the clerk on 7/17/2017 to plaintiff's counsel for service upon the named defendant. To date, an affidavit of service has not been filed with the court nor has an appearance been formally made by the defendant. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to file a status report on or before 10/6/2017. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 10/3/2017. (sal )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Mon 07/17 10:29 AM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/11/2017. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 07/17 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Suit-Kote Corporation. (see)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 16, 2017
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/17 9:55 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Suit-Kote Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0206-4070268) filed by Brian Knickerbocker.(see)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet