New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:17-cv-05389
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2017
Terminated:Mar 28, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2018 4:19 AM EST
Defendant
Marina Novikova
Represented By
Elizabeth Frances Lorell
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Matthew P Gallo
Gordon & Rees LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Steifman
Represented By
John Daniel Bryan
Jackson Lewis P.C. (wp)
contact info
Joseph Michael Martin
Jackson Lewis P.C. (wp)
contact info
Defendant
Utilisave, LLC
Represented By
John Daniel Bryan
Jackson Lewis P.C. (wp)
contact info
Joseph Michael Martin
Jackson Lewis P.C. (wp)
contact info
Plaintiff
Trevor Isaac
Represented By
Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras
Derek Smith Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
20 20 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Wed 07/18 6:51 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff Trevor Isaac ("Plaintiff") and Defendants Utilisave, LLC, Marina Novikova and Michael Steifinan ("Defendants"), through their undersigned attorneys who state that they have been authorized to enter into this Stipulation, that the Parties have agreed to amicably resolve any and all claims by Plaintiff against Defendants in this action, and have authorized their undersigned counsel to stipulate, consent and agree to dismiss the instant action with prejudice to Plaintiff and with no award of counsel fees or costs. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/18/2018) (ft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
19 19 2 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Wed 03/28 12:45 PM
ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: By letter dated March 28, 2018, the parties reported to the Court that they have reached a settlement in this case. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that this action be conditionally discontinued without prejudice and without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, the parties may submit to the Court their own Stipulation of Settlement and Dismissal for the Court to So Order. Otherwise, within such time Plaintiff may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the active calendar of this Court in the event that the settlement is not consummated. Upon such application for reinstatement, the parties shall continue to be subject to the Court's jurisdiction, the Court shall promptly reinstate the action to its active docket, and the parties shall be directed to appear before the Court, without the necessity of additional process, on a date within ten (10) days of the application, to schedule remaining pretrial proceedings and/or dispositive motions, as appropriate. This Order shall be deemed a final discontinuance of the action with prejudice in the event that Plaintiff has not requested restoration of the case to the active calendar within such 30-day period. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/28/2018) (ama)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Letter Wed 03/28 10:57 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Joseph M. Martin dated 03/28/2018 re: Settlement status. Document filed by Michael Steifman, Utilisave, LLC.(Martin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2018
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 02/09 5:08 PM
ORDER granting16 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference, previously scheduled to take place on February 20, 2018, is hereby ADJOURNED to April 10, 2018, at 4:30 p.m., in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/10/2018 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/9/2018) (anc)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 02/09 2:39 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John D. Bryan dated 02/09/18. Document filed by Michael Steifman, Utilisave, LLC.(Bryan, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
15 15 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 01/09 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on February 20, 2018, at 3:00pm, in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, and as further set forth herein. (Initial Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/9/2018) (ras)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2017
adr Mediator Session Held Fri 12/08 4:09 PM
Mediator Session Held on 12/7/2017 at 40 Foley Square.(mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
adr Mediator Session Scheduled Mon 11/13 12:31 PM
MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 12/7/2017, 10:00 AM at the U.S. Courthouse located at 40 Foley Square New York, NY 10007.(cda)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2017
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Fri 10/27 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 11/27/2017.(cda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
13 13 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 10/24 2:30 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/3/2017. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/23 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew P Gallo on behalf of Marina Novikova. (Gallo, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/23 1:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Steifman, Utilisave, LLC.(Martin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/23 1:23 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Utilisave, LLC.(Martin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/23 10:43 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Marina Novikova.(Lorell, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2017
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 09/25 12:51 PM
MEMO ENDORSED: granting7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John D. Bryan dated 09/25/2017. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered. Michael Steifman answer due 10/23/2017; Utilisave, LLC answer due 10/23/2017 (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/25/2017) (js)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 09/25 9:26 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from John D. Bryan dated 09/25/2017. Document filed by Michael Steifman, Utilisave, LLC.(Bryan, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/23 2:37 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Marina Novikova waiver sent on 8/23/2017, answer due 10/23/2017. Document filed by Trevor Isaac. (Cabeceiras, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2017
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/31 4:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Steifman waiver sent on 7/31/2017, answer due 9/29/2017; Utilisave, LLC waiver sent on 7/31/2017, answer due 9/29/2017. Document filed by Trevor Isaac. (Cabeceiras, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/18 12:00 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marina Novikova, Michael Steifman, Utilisave, LLC. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 07/18 11:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Marina Novikova, Michael Steifman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 07/18 11:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alexander Gabriel Cabeceiras. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 07/18 11:58 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 07/18 11:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 07/18 11:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
3 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Utilisave, LLC, Marina Novikova, Michael Steifman, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Trevor Isaac. (Cabeceiras, Alexander)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cabeceiras, Alexander)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Marina Novikova, Michael Steifman, Utilisave, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13904905)Document filed by Trevor Isaac.(Cabeceiras, Alexander)
Related: [-]