CARROLL et al v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey L Schmehl |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-03173 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jan 13, 2018 3:46 AM EST |
Defendant
STATE FARM
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANIES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN P. CARROLL
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SUSAN C. CARROLL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Tue 10/10 1:25 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/10/17. 10/10/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bac, ) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation (Regarding Certain Facts)
Mon 09/25 2:46 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Count II - Bad Faith of Plaintiffs Complaint by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (FRIEDMAN, DAVID) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 08/07 11:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KEVIN P. CARROLL, SUSAN C. CARROLL.(KOTSATOS, JOHN) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Dismiss, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Leave Amend, | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/01 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID RONALD FRIEDMAN on behalf of STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (FRIEDMAN, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 07/26 2:31 PM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) SHALL BE HELD ON TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 12, 2017 AT 10:00 A.M., IN THE CHAMBERS OF JUDGE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL, THE MADISON BUILDING, ROOM 401, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, BERKS COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/25/17. 7/26/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 07/26 2:32 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/12/2017 10:00 AM IN Reading BEFORE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. (er, ) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 07/24 11:10 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificates of Service.(DRAKAS, GARY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint Exhibits A - G, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint Exhibits H - S, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint Exhibits T - Z, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint Exhibits AA - MM, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 7 Memorandum of Law in Support | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 07/18 11:40 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DRAKAS, GARY) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/18 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANIES, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF NORTHAMPTON COUNTY, case number C-48-CV-2017-4941. (Filing fee $ 411.00 receipt number APE004268)(ky, ) (ky, ). (ky, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form | ||
Att: 4 (7/18/2017) Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 (7/18/2017) Exhibit | ||
Att: 6 (7/18/2017) Exhibit |