RhythmOne LLC v. DataXu, Inc.
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-11347 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 17, 2018 3:43 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
DataXu, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
RhythmOne LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DataXu, Inc.
281 Summer Street
Boston, MA 02210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RhythmOne LLC
251 Kearny Street 2nd Floor
San Francisco, CA 94108 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator
Judge Jennifer C. Boal
Terminated: 01/16/2018
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/28 3:54 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by DataXu, Inc..(Stern, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1 | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
utility
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/20 3:43 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) |
|
42 | 42
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 03/20 3:41 PM
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot35 Motion for Protective Order based on the representations of counsel in open court this date. (Russo, Noreen) |
|
41 | 41
minutes
Motion Hearing
Tue 03/20 3:30 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Motion Hearing held on 3/20/2018 re35 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by RhythmOne LLC. The parties indicate that the case is settled in principle: there is a short form settlement agreement with a long form expected within a week with dismissal thereafter. The parties agree that the deposition is off. Based on the representations in court this date the court will find the motion moot as there is nothing for the court to act on. In terms of the schedule the parties have a status on 4/9/18 with Judge Casper and they agree to put everything over until that time where the case will either be settled or, if not, scheduling issues may be addressed with Judge Casper. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Dharnidharka (by phone), Norton, Lashway) (Russo, Noreen) |
|
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/20 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin M. Stern on behalf of DataXu, Inc. (Stern, Benjamin) |
|
39 | 39
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Tue 03/20 9:52 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion35 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2018 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) |
|
38 | 38
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/20 8:47 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell Referred for: Events Only (e). Motions referred:35 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order . (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 03/19 5:23 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re35 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by RhythmOne LLC. (Norton, Miles) |
|
36 | 36
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Mon 03/19 5:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re35 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Declaration of Rajiv Dharnidharka filed by RhythmOne LLC.(Norton, Miles) |
|
Att: 1 19 pgs Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 12 pgs Exhibit 4 | ||
35 | 35
3
pgs
motion
Protective Order
Mon 03/19 5:15 PM
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order by RhythmOne LLC.(Norton, Miles) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/19 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Miles D. Norton on behalf of RhythmOne LLC (Norton, Miles) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
adr
Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider
Tue 01/16 12:48 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider: Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal reports that this case did not settle. This case should be restored to your trial list. Should the parties wish to resume mediation efforts in the future, they should contact the Deputy Clerk, Steve York.(York, Steve) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 01/09 5:15 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal: Telephone Conference held on 1/9/2018. The Court reviewed preliminary matters with the parties prior to the upcoming mediation. (Court Reporter: SEALED Digital Recording) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, The parties should first seek leave of the Court. If approved, please then go to[LINK:http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Attorneys present: Dharnidharka & Brown for plaintiff; Lashway & Dale for the defendant;) (York, Steve) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Protective Order
Tue 12/05 2:09 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. PROTECTIVE ORDER(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 12/05 2:08 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting28 Motion for Protective Order (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Protective Order
Wed 11/29 2:04 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by RhythmOne LLC.(Brown, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
discov
Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
Tue 11/07 11:12 AM
This entry is deleted at the request of counsel b/c it should not have been filed Modified on 11/7/2017 (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/27 3:32 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for January 12, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for January 9, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve) |
|
25 | 25
utility
Notice of Assignment to ADR Provider
Fri 10/27 10:32 AM
Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Garvin, Brendan) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to ADR
Tue 10/24 11:53 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 10/24 11:51 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER.(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Tue 10/24 11:46 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Scheduling Conference held on 10/23/2017. Initial disclosures due by 11/6/17. Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2017. Fact discovery to be completed by 3/30/18. Opening expert disclosures by 4/27/18. Rebuttal expert disclosures by 5/24/18. Expert discovery to be completed by 6/14/2018. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/13/2018. Status Conference set for 4/9/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. Counsel request referral to mediation but that it not be scheduled until January, 2018. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Jennifer Brown for the plaintiff. Scott Lashway for the defendant.) (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
6
pgs
misc
Joint statement re scheduling conference
Mon 10/16 12:52 PM
JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference .(Brown, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix A | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
discov
Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1
Fri 10/13 2:32 PM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (d)(3) . (Lashway, Scott) |
|
19 | 19
2
pgs
discov
Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1
Fri 10/13 11:15 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Brown, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
11
pgs
answer
Answer to Counterclaim
Fri 09/15 4:54 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by RhythmOne LLC.(Brown, Jennifer) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Thu 09/07 9:28 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting16 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Continue
Wed 09/06 4:59 PM
Assented to MOTION to Continue The Court's September 25, 2017 Scheduling Conference by DataXu, Inc..(Lashway, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys
Tue 08/29 3:59 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. Standing Order Re: Courtroom Opportunities for Relatively Inexperienced Attorneys(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Scheduling Conference
Tue 08/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 08/29 3:57 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting nunc pro tunc 11 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/25/17 to Respond to Complaint by DataXu, Inc. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
23
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 08/25 3:13 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against RhythmOne LLC by DataXu, Inc..(Lashway, Scott) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 08/18 1:18 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 25, 2017 to Respond to Complaint by DataXu, Inc..(Lashway, Scott) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/11 5:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DataXu, Inc.. (Lashway, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/11 12:00 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint to 8/18/17 (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 08/11 11:11 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 18, 2017 to Respond to Complaint by DataXu, Inc..(Lashway, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 07/26 11:38 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Rajiv Dharnidharka. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/21 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Lashway on behalf of DataXu, Inc. (Lashway, Scott) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/21 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to DataXu, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (DaSilva, Carolina) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Fri 07/21 3:13 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (DaSilva, Carolina) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/21 12:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Rajiv Dharnidharka Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6721636 by RhythmOne LLC.(Unter, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/21 11:29 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RhythmOne LLC. (Unter, Jennifer) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/21 11:22 AM
COMPLAINT against DataXu, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6720818 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by RhythmOne LLC.(Unter, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Category Form, | ||
Att: 9 Summons |