New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Anne Y Shields
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:17-cv-04334
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2017
Terminated:Jun 11, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 17, 2018 4:26 AM EST
Defendant
Justin Spoto
136 Wall Street
Huntington, NY 11743
Represented By
Jack Piana
Piana & Gioe
contact info
Michael S Leinoff
Piana & Gioe
contact info
Defendant
Mary Spoto
136 Wall Street
Huntington, NY 11743
Represented By
Jack Piana
Piana & Gioe
contact info
Michael S Leinoff
Piana & Gioe
contact info
Defendant
Culinary Studio, Inc.
136 Wall Street
Huntigton, NY 11743
Represented By
Jack Piana
Piana & Gioe
contact info
Michael S Leinoff
Piana & Gioe
contact info
Plaintiff
Angel Juaquin Acosta
Represented By
Ruchama Leah Cohen
Samuel & Stein
contact info
Michael Samuel
Samuel & Stein
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 11, 2018
order Order of Settlement Mon 06/11 4:13 PM
Order of Settlement: Upon review of the Settlement Agreement (DE 31), the Court finds the terms of the settlement are fair and reasonable, consistent with the factors in Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199 (2d Cir. 2015). Therefore, the proposed Settlement Agreement is hereby SO ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/11/2018. (Minerva, Deanna)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/12 9:23 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASEOrdered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 6/11/2018. (Torres, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
31 31 misc Settlement Agreement Wed 06/06 3:02 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT revised per the Court's instructions, by Angel Juaquin Acosta (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 13, 2018
30 30 misc Settlement Agreement Fri 04/13 3:17 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT with Fairness Memorandum by Angel Juaquin Acosta (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Agreement - fully executed
Thursday, April 12, 2018
29 29 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/12 2:32 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields for all further proceedings. Judge Arthur D. Spatt no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
utility Case No Longer Referred Thu 04/12 2:30 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
28 28 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/11 5:08 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Angel Juaquin Acosta. (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/03 11:55 AM
Electronic ORDER granting27 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The time for Parties to submit a settlement agreement for the District Court's review is extended until April 16, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/3/2018. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 02, 2018
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 04/02 11:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Settlement Agreement by Angel Juaquin Acosta. (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/01 10:07 AM
Electronic ORDER granting26 Motion to Stay Discovery. As Parties are negotiating terms of a settlement, the discovery deadlines are stayed for 30 days. Parties shall submit a settlement agreement for the District Court's review by April 2, 2018. If Parties cannot submit a settlement agreement by that time, they shall submit a joint status letter to this Court explaining the reason for the delay. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 3/1/2018. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
26 26 1 pgs motion Stay Wed 02/28 12:28 PM
First MOTION to Stay Discovery Proceedings pending settlement by Culinary Studio, Inc., Justin Spoto, Mary Spoto. (Leinoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 02/27 10:34 AM
Electronic ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. As parties are engaged in settlement discussions, parties are directed submit a further joint status by 3/2/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 2/27/2018. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 02/16 4:32 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Culinary Studio, Inc., Justin Spoto, Mary Spoto. (Leinoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
order Status Report Order Mon 01/22 10:24 AM
Electronic ORDER re24 : As parties are engaged in settlement discussions, parties are directed submit a further joint status report on 2/16/2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/22/2018. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
24 24 misc Status Report Fri 01/19 12:27 PM
STATUS REPORT by Angel Juaquin Acosta (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 01/09 9:59 AM
Electronic ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The time for parties to submit a joint status report21 , as required by paragraph 5(2) of the Discovery Order, is extended until January 19, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/9/2018. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Extension of Time to File Document Mon 01/08 1:44 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery per Court order , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Update by Culinary Studio, Inc., Justin Spoto, Mary Spoto. (Leinoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/05 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S Leinoff on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Leinoff, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2017
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/12 3:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The attached discovery schedule is so Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/12/2017. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 10/12 3:35 PM
Electronic ORDER granting20 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The Conference scheduled for 10/16/17 is adjourned without a date. Parties are directed to comply with the discovery order, DE21 , which requires the parties to jointly file a Report Regarding Settlement on January 5, 2018. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/12/2017. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
20 20 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 10/11 5:35 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Angel Juaquin Acosta. (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed FLSA Discovery Plan
order Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone Wed 10/11 10:17 AM
Electronic ORDER denying19 Motion to Appear by Telephone. The Court denies the request to appear by telephone. Instead, the Parties are directed to confer and fill out a proposed discovery plan for cases alleging FLSA violations (which is found in this Court's rules). After conferring, and no later than end of day on 10/12/17, parties may file a motion to adjourn the conference for a date after step 5 of the FLSA discovery plan work sheet is to be completed. The proposed discovery worksheet must be attached to the Parties' motion to adjourn. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/11/2017. (Casalini, Rosalinde)
Related: [-]
utility Email Test Wed 10/11 2:19 PM
Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Coleman, Laurie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2017
19 19 motion Appear by Telephone Tue 10/10 1:20 PM
Motion to Appear by Telephone by Angel Juaquin Acosta. (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/13 11:27 AM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 830 before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. See Order and Attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 9/13/2017. (Torres, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AYS Rules
Tuesday, September 12, 2017
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/12 11:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Piana, Jack)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2017
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/01 10:27 AM
Electronic ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. On consent of the parties, the time for the Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including 9/12/2017. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/1/2017. (Bagnuola, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2017
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/31 11:06 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Summons and Complaint by Culinary Studio, Inc., Justin Spoto, Mary Spoto. (Piana, Jack)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/31 10:59 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Culinary Studio, Inc. (Piana, Jack)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/31 10:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jack Piana on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Piana, Jack)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/23 12:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angel Juaquin Acosta. Justin Spoto served on 8/10/2017, answer due 8/31/2017. (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/23 12:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angel Juaquin Acosta. Mary Spoto served on 8/10/2017, answer due 8/31/2017. (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2017
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/21 11:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angel Juaquin Acosta. Culinary Studio, Inc. served on 8/15/2017, answer due 9/5/2017. (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2017
10 10 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 07/24 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Mary Spoto. (McMahon, Carol)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 07/24 3:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Justin Spoto. (McMahon, Carol)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 07/24 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Culinary Studio, Inc.. (McMahon, Carol)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 07/24 3:23 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/24 3:20 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/24 12:37 PM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Juaquin Acosta (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/24 12:36 PM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Juaquin Acosta (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/24 12:36 PM
Proposed Summons. by Angel Juaquin Acosta (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/24 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ruchama Leah Cohen on behalf of Angel Juaquin Acosta (aty to be noticed) (Cohen, Ruchama)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/24 3:22 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/21 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Justin Spoto, Mary Spoto, The Culinary Studio filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9699574 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Angel Juaquin Acosta. (Samuel, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet