Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Charles J Kahn, Jr
Case #: 3:17-cv-00485
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2017
Terminated:Sep 22, 2017
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 17, 2018 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
BELINDA DEKOZAN
Defendant
DARLENE DICKEY
Defendant
J ALAN KOHR
Defendant
PARKS
Defendant
KATHLYN WHITE
Plaintiff
ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM
1015 ARIOLA DRIVE
PENSACOLA BEACH, FL 32561


1. Florida Wife Sues Judge for Prohibiting Her to See Her Elderly Husband (huffingtonpost.com)
Submitted Thu 08/03/2017
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 22, 2017
10 10 1 pgs notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 09/22 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P.(a)(1)(A)(I), by ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM. (MB)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 09/22 12:23 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal,9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (MB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2017
9 9 6 pgs motion Report and Recommendation Thu 09/14 1:39 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - That this case be DISMISSED due to lack of jurisdiction. That the clerk be directed to close the file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 09/14/2017. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 10/12/2017 . (MB)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2017
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/25 10:26 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against J ALAN KOHR, KATHLYN WHITE, BELINDA DEKOZAN, WYMA PARKS, (added PEREGRINE LANDING), filed by ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM. (No service copies). (MB)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 08/25 10:27 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:8 First Amended Complaint. (No service copies). (MB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 24, 2017
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/24 2:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against J ALAN KOHR, KATHLYN WHITE, BELINDA DEKOZAN, WYMA PARKS, (added PEREGRINE LANDING), filed by ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM. (No service copies). (MB)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 08/24 3:02 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against J ALAN KOHR, KATHLYN WHITE, BELINDA DEKOZAN, WYMA PARKS, (added PEREGRING LANDING), filed by ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM. (No service copies). (MB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 08/09 2:52 PM
ORDER. Sam Sugar's "Motion for Leave to the Honorable Chief Judge to File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff" (doc. 5 ) is DENIED. The brief shall remain in the electronic file, but the court will not consider it. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 8/9/2017. (sdw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 08/01 10:50 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:5 MOTION for Leave (titled, "Motion for Leave to the Honorable Chief Judge To File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff"), by ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM.. Referred to CHARLES J KAHN, JR. (MB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit-Amicus Curia Brief
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
5 5 motion Leave to File Document Tue 08/01 10:42 AM
MOTION for Leave (titled, "Motion for Leave to the Honorable Chief Judge To File Amicus Brief in Support of Plaintiff"), by ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM. (MB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 16 pgs Exhibit-Amicus Curia Brief
4 4 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/26 2:46 PM
ORDER. Clerk shall send plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use in actions under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 (for non-prisoners). Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either a notice of voluntary dismissal or an amended civil rights complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 07/26/2017. (Amended Complaint due by 8/28/2017 .) (Form mailed w/Order). (MB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2017
3 3 notice Notice to Pro Se Mon 07/24 1:26 PM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant, ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM. (MB)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 07/24 1:27 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint. (No service copies). (MB)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 07/24 1:21 PM
Initial Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN3-11050. Fee status updated to paid. (MB)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/24 1:17 PM
COMPLAINT against BELINDA DEKOZAN, DARLENE DICKEY, J ALAN KOHR, PARKS, KATHLYN WHITE (Filing fee $400.), filed by ELIZABETH LEAL CUNNINGHAM. (No service copies). (MB)
Related: [-]