New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:17-cv-05391
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Jan 20, 2018 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC")
Represented By
MARK K. SILVER
Coughlin Duffy LLP
contact info
LORNA A. DOTRO
Coughlin Duffy LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
GENE M. WILLIAMS
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Defendant
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By
SCOTT A. JAMES
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
SUSAN M. SHARKO
Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
contact info
JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI
Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
GENE M. WILLIAMS
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
Defendant
PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC")
Represented By
THOMAS T. LOCKE
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
SHERYL LISA AXELROD
The Axelrod Firm PC
contact info
In Re
JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Plaintiff
DAVID C. WALDMAN
Represented By
PRISCILLA E. JIMENEZ
Kline & Specter PC
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSAN A. WALDMAN
Represented By
PRISCILLA E. JIMENEZ
Kline & Specter PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 28, 2024
14 14 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 03/28 2:01 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney THOMAS T. LOCKE terminated. Attorney SUZANNE I. TURPIN for PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (PCPC) added.. (TURPIN, SUZANNE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
13 13 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 02/14 11:25 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson, Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/14/2023. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 11, 2018
12 12 30+ pgs order Order Fri 10/12 1:34 PM
ORDER that each of the Pre-CMO Cases identified in Exhibit A are DISMISSED, without prejudice, as to Defendant PCPC only. In the event a dismissal is inadvertently entered in a case not subject to dismissal for the reasons stated above, this will constitute grounds for the effected plaintiff to reinstate his or her action against PCPC, and the statute of limitations in such a case would be tolled from the date of the entry of dismissal until the date of reinstatement. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/11/2018.(jjc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/25 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MARK K. SILVER on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") (SILVER, MARK)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/25 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LORNA A. DOTRO on behalf of IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") (DOTRO, LORNA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/23 7:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/23 6:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/17 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/17 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/17 11:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by GENE M. WILLIAMS on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC. (WILLIAMS, GENE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2017
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/03 8:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") (LOCKE, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/28 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHERYL LISA AXELROD on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") (AXELROD, SHERYL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 07/25 10:34 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiff's attorney information and serve. Issued By *John Moller* (jem)
Related: [-]
qc QC - ACO re 33-1 Tue 07/25 10:34 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Effective July, 2017, attorneys must electronically open and file civil cases in CM/ECF. The case you electronically filed in 33-1 has been processed, however, use of 33-1 is being discontinued on August 14, 2017 so please familiarize yourself with the process. An Attorney Case Opening Guide, as well as other relevant documentation, can be found on our website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] or contact the ECF Assistance Line. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/25 10:33 AM
COMPLAINT against IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC"), JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL ("PCPC") ( Filing and Admin fee $400 receipt number 7982702) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUSAN A. WALDMAN, DAVID C. WALDMAN.(jem)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet