In Re: Friedberg
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Alfred V Covello |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-00019 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 1:44 PM EST |
Appellant
Richard H. Friedberg
P.O. Box 643927
Vero Beach, FL 32963 |
|
Appellee
Melissa Zelen Neier
|
Represented By
|
Bankruptcy Notice
Judge Alan H.W. Shiff
|
|
In Re
115 Allen Ground LLC
|
|
In Re
Allen & Delancey, LLC
|
|
In Re
Richard H. Friedberg
|
|
Notice
U.S. Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER granting17 motion for reconsideration, but the relief request is denied. The court's ruling shall remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on November 14, 2014. (Smith, C) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 OBJECTION re17 MOTION for Reconsideration re16 Judgment filed by Melissa Zelen Neier. (Falcone, K.) | |
Friday, October 03, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re16 Judgment by Richard H. Friedberg.Responses due by 10/24/2014 (Falcone, K.) | |
Thursday, September 18, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 JUDGMENT entered in favor of appellees Melissa Zelen Neier. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 9/17/14.(Ferguson, L.) | |
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.) | ||
Wednesday, August 13, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 ORDER granting9 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on August 13, 2014. (Meskill, J) | |
Friday, March 14, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 REPLY to appellee's reply in further support of9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard H. Friedberg. (Grady, B.) | |
Thursday, March 06, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Appellee's REPLY in further Support of9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Melissa Zelen Neier. (Ferguson, L.) | |
Wednesday, February 26, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Appellant's Rebuttal to Appellee's re9 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum in Support filed by Richard H. Friedberg. (Ferguson, L.) | |
Monday, February 24, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 Appellant's Rebuttal to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss - Supplement 1 by Richard H. Friedberg. (Ferguson, L.) | |
10 | 10 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF - Rebuttal to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss - Corrected Copy by Richard H. Friedberg. (Ferguson, L.) | |
Thursday, February 06, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Melissa Zelen Neier.Responses due by 2/27/2014(Ferguson, L.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant Opposing Motion to Dismiss | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol J. Faherty on behalf of Melissa Zelen Neier (Ferguson, L.) | |
Wednesday, January 22, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Corrected and Amended Appellant's BRIEF by Richard H. Friedberg. (Ferguson, L.) | |
Saturday, January 18, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Appellant's BRIEF by Richard H. Friedberg. (Ferguson, L.) | |
Friday, January 17, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Related Cases by Melissa Zelen Neier (Ferguson, L.) | |
Tuesday, January 07, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE to counsel re: briefing. Signed by Clerk on 1/7/14.(Walker, J.) | |
Monday, January 06, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Designation of Items-BKY re1 Bankruptcy Appeal to be included in Record on Appeal. (Walker, J.) | |
2 | 2 USBC Transmittal Form. (Walker, J.) | |
1 | 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-51245 , filed by Richard H. Friedberg.(Walker, J.) | |
Att: 1 Doc. 1508 |