Case Filed:Jul 26, 2017
Terminated:Nov 29, 2017

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 67 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
9 9 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Wed 11/29 1:28 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/29/2017: ADOPTING8 Petitioner's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and DISMISSING CASE. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Joseph R. Deboer)(jm)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/29 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by United States of America.(Carter, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 16, 2017
7 7 minutes Show Cause Hearing Thu 11/16 9:38 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/16/2017. Continued Show Cause Hearing set for 12/1/2017 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Sheryl Stawski) (cb)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 11/16 11:16 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 12/1/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. (jm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
6 6 service US Marshal 285 Form Mon 10/30 11:01 AM
US Marshal 285 Form (Carter, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
5 5 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 09/19 11:28 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 9/19/2017.3 United States' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Respondent GRANTED. Show Cause Hearing RE-SET for 11/16/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. A copy of this Order, the petition and exhibits to be personally served on Joseph R. Deboer by the United States Marshals Service within 30 days. Within 21 days of service, Respondent to file and serve a written response to the petition supported by affidavits, as well as any motions Respondent desires to make. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2017
4 4 misc Supplement Wed 09/13 1:27 PM
SUPPLEMENT by United States of America to Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Respondent and for a New Hearing Date - Declaration of Camilla Kadish . (Carter, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
3 3 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/07 9:12 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Respondent and for a New Hearing Date by United States of America.(Carter, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - USM-285,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 31, 2017
2 2 order Order to Show Cause Mon 07/31 2:49 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/31/2017. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/10/2017 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. A copy of this Order, the petition and exhibits to be personally served on Joseph R. Deboer by the United States Marshals Service within 30 days. Within 21 days of service, respondent to file and serve a written response to the petition supported by affidavits, as well as any motions respondent desires to make. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
1 1 motion Motion to Enforce IRS Summons or Subpoena Wed 07/26 3:08 PM
MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons(Carter, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ryan Light,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 07/26 3:29 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller. (lls)
Related: [-]