Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Joel B Toomey
Case #: 3:17-cv-00854
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2017
Terminated:Oct 17, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jan 21, 2018 4:36 AM EST
Defendant
City of Lake City, Florida
Represented By
Susan S. Erdelyi
Marks Gray, PA
contact info
Defendant
Gerald L Ford
Represented By
Kevin Charles Kostelnik
Sniffen & Spellman, PA
contact info
Michael P. Spellman
Sniffen & Spellman, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Benoit
Represented By
Andrew Michael Bonderud
The Bonderud Law Firm, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
58 58 misc Bill of costs Tue 04/09 9:50 AM
BILL OF COSTS taxed against Jason Benoit in the amount of $1,858.20. Signed by Deputy Clerk. (RH)
Related: [-]
57 57 misc Bill of costs Tue 04/09 9:47 AM
BILL OF COSTS taxed against Jason Benoit in the amount of $2,154.95. Signed by Deputy Clerk. (RH)
Related: [-]
56 56 order Judgment Tue 04/09 9:41 AM
JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, entered April 4, 2019, is hereby entered in favor of Defendant City of Lake City, Florida and against Plaintiff Jason Benoit in the amount of $2,154.95 for costs and in favor of Defendant Gerald L. Ford and against Plaintiff Jason Benoit in the amount of $1,858.20 for costs. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/9/2019. (RH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2019
55 55 3 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Thu 04/04 3:52 PM
ORDER adopting 54 Report and Recommendation; granting, in part, and denying, in part, 45 Defendant City of Lake City's Motion to Tax Costs and 47 Defendant Gerald L. Ford's Motion to Tax Costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to tax costs in the amounts stated in the Order, adjust the Bills of Costs as stated in the Report, and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/4/2019. (JW)
Related: [-]